Collymore v. Growing Child Pediatrics, PA et al
Plaintiff: Adzelle Collymore
Defendant: Growing Child Pediatrics, PA and GCP Management Services, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2022cv00106
Filed: March 23, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER FOR DISCOVERY PLAN sent to all parties. Signed by District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 4/21/2022. Copy sent via US Mail to Clayton G. Anderson of The Masters Law Firm at 181 Summers St., Charleston, WV 25301. (Stouch, L.)
April 21, 2022 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Stouch, L.)
April 20, 2022 Filing 14 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by GCP Management Services, Inc., Growing Child Pediatrics, PA. (Lindsay, David)
April 19, 2022 Filing 13 Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Adzelle Collymore. (Stouch, L.)
April 19, 2022 Filing 12 Notice of Appearance by Clayton G. Anderson on behalf of Adzelle Collymore. (Stouch, L.)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to File in Paper. Signed by District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 4/19/2022. Copy sent via US Mail to Plaintiff's Counsel, Clayton G. Anderson of The Masters Law Firm at 181 Summers St., Charleston, WV 25301. (Stouch, L.)
April 13, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to File in Paper filed by Adzelle Collymore. (Attachments: #1 Proposed, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope, #4 Finanical Disclosure Form, #5 Cover Letter, #6 Notice of Appearance, #7 Cover Letter) (Stouch, L.)
April 13, 2022 Motion Submitted to District Judge Terrence W. Boyle regarding #10 MOTION for Leave to File in Paper. (Stouch, L.)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer regarding #7 Notice of Removal. GCP Management Services, Inc. and Growing Child Pediatrics, PA answer due 4/20/2022. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 3/25/2022. Copy sent via US Mail to Plaintiff's Counsel, Clayton G. Anderson of The Masters Law Firm at 181 Summers St., Charleston, WV 25301. (Stouch, L.)
March 25, 2022 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by GCP Management Services, Inc., Growing Child Pediatrics, PA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Lindsay, David)
March 25, 2022 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. (Stouch, L.)
March 23, 2022 Filing 7 CORRECTED NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Growing Child Pediatrics, PA, GCP Management Services, Inc. from Wake County Superior Court, case number 22 cv 001842. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0417-6487937), filed by Growing Child Pediatrics, PA, GCP Management Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Articles of Amendment, #2 Exhibit B- Complaint) (Lindsay, David) Modified on 3/23/2022 to show that this is the corrected notice of removal. (Rudd, D.)
March 23, 2022 Filing 6 Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Plaintiff's Counsel, Clayton G. Anderson of The Masters Law Firm at 181 Summers St., Charleston, WV 25301 mailed via US Mail on March 23, 2022. (Rudd, D.)
March 23, 2022 Filing 5 Notice filed by GCP Management Services, Inc., Growing Child Pediatrics, PA regarding #1 Notice of Removal, Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet. (Lindsay, David)
March 23, 2022 Filing 4 Notice filed by GCP Management Services, Inc., Growing Child Pediatrics, PA regarding #1 Notice of Removal, Civil Cover Sheet. (Lindsay, David)
March 23, 2022 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by David C. Lindsay on behalf of GCP Management Services, Inc., Growing Child Pediatrics, PA. (Lindsay, David)
March 23, 2022 Filing 2 Financial Disclosure Statement by GCP Management Services, Inc., Growing Child Pediatrics, PA (Lindsay, David)
March 23, 2022 Filing 1 SEE CORRECTED NOTICE OF REMOVAL AT DE #7 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Growing Child Pediatrics, PA, GCP Management Services, Inc. from Wake County Superior Court, case number 22 cv 001842. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0417-6487937), filed by Growing Child Pediatrics, PA, GCP Management Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Articles of Amendment, #2 Exhibit Complaint) (Lindsay, David) Modified on 3/23/2022 to show that corrected notice of removal was filed at #7 . (Rudd, D.)
March 23, 2022 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Notice of Removal. Filing is not text searchable. Local Civil Rule 5.1 requires that all documents submitted for filing be in a text searchable format. (Rudd, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collymore v. Growing Child Pediatrics, PA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adzelle Collymore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Growing Child Pediatrics, PA
Represented By: David C. Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GCP Management Services, Inc.
Represented By: David C. Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?