Teasley v. O'Neal et al
Plaintiff: Kenya Teasley
Defendant: Tasha O'Neal and F. Blair Williams
Case Number: 5:2022cv00115
Filed: March 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2022 Filing 7 Proof of Service & RESPONSE regarding #6 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint filed by Kenya Teasley. (Attachments: #1 FedEx Tracking Information, #2 Envelope) (Stouch, L.)
April 26, 2022 Notice to Counsel - Pro se party has revoked consent to receive electronic notice of filings. All future filings must be served on the pro se party in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(b). (Stouch, L.)
April 18, 2022 Filing 6 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint filed by Tasha O'Neal, F. Blair Williams. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (O'Brien, Elizabeth)
April 18, 2022 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Elizabeth Curran O'Brien on behalf of All Defendants. (O'Brien, Elizabeth)
April 18, 2022 TEXT ORDER granting Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time #6 . For good cause shown, it is ordered that Defendants have up to and including May 26, 2022, within which to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint #1 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 4/18/2022. (Hockaday, A.)
April 18, 2022 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #6 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint. (Sellers, N.)
April 5, 2022 Notice of Pro Se E-Noticing - Pro se party Kenya Teasley has consented to receiving electronic service of all motions, notices, orders, and documents in civil cases in the Eastern District of North Carolina. All documents filed in CM-ECF will be served on this party via email pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 5.1. (Stouch, L.)
March 25, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Tasha O'Neal, F. Blair Williams. (Summons issued at intake) (Rudd, D.)
March 25, 2022 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Kenya Teasley. (Rudd, D.)
March 25, 2022 Filing 2 Notice of Self-Representation filed by Kenya Teasley. (Rudd, D.)
March 25, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Tasha O'Neal, F. Blair Williams (Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number RAL090887.), filed by Kenya Teasley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Rudd, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Teasley v. O'Neal et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenya Teasley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tasha O'Neal
Represented By: Elizabeth Curran O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F. Blair Williams
Represented By: Elizabeth Curran O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?