Perry v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Rebecca Perry
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 5:2022cv00154
Filed: April 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard E Myers
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 206 Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 25, 2022 Filing 9 Process Receipt and Return - US Attorney General served on 5/18/2022. (Waddell, K.)
May 25, 2022 Filing 8 Process Receipt and Return - Commissioner of Social Security served on 5/16/2022. (Waddell, K.)
May 19, 2022 Filing 7 Process Receipt and Return - US Attorney served on 5/18/2022, answer due 7/17/2022. (Waddell, K.)
April 20, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 US Marshals Service Forms) (Waddell, K.)
April 20, 2022 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi, filed by Rebecca Perry. (Waddell, K.)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 4/20/2022. (Waddell, K.)
April 20, 2022 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by Rebecca Perry (Arrowood, Derrick)
April 20, 2022 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Derrick Kyle Arrowood on behalf of Rebecca Perry. (Arrowood, Derrick)
April 20, 2022 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis , filed by Rebecca Perry. (Attachments: #1 US Marshal Form, #2 Complaint, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Arrowood, Derrick)
April 20, 2022 Remark - Filed-stamped copies of #4 order, summonses, complaint, notice of appearance and financial disclosure statement forwarded to U.S. Marshal for service, along with USM-285 forms. (Waddell, K.)
April 20, 2022 Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. regarding #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Waddell, K.)
April 20, 2022 Notice of Social Security Case Filing. (Rudd, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perry v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Perry
Represented By: Derrick Kyle Arrowood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?