Sorrell et al v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Chad Sorrell and Christine Sorrell
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 5:2022cv00168
Filed: April 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2022 Filing 7 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Lindsay S. Stevens on behalf of Chad Sorrell, Christine Sorrell. (Stevens, Lindsay)
April 29, 2022 Filing 6 Financial Disclosure Statement by Christine Sorrell (Ochsner, Ann)
April 29, 2022 Filing 5 Financial Disclosure Statement by Chad Sorrell (Ochsner, Ann)
April 29, 2022 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Ann C. Ochsner on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Ochsner, Ann)
April 29, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company. *NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summonses and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4.* (Collins, S.)
April 29, 2022 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Collins, S.)
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order - At the direction of the Court, and for the continued efficient administration of justice, the above-captioned case is redesignated as a Western Division case. The Honorable Louise Wood Flanagan, United States District Judge, will remain the presiding judge. All future documents should reflect the new case number of 5:22-CV-168-FL. No further filing shall be made in 4:22-CV-40-FL. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 4/28/2022. (Collins, S.)
April 28, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Chad Sorrell and Christine Sorrell against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0417-6537945.), filed by Chad Sorrell, Christine Sorrell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons) (Ochsner, Ann)
April 28, 2022 Case transferred in from Eastern Division on 04/28/2022. Case Number 4:22-cv-40. (Collins, S.)
April 28, 2022 Notice to Counsel - This case should have been filed in the Western division. The Clerk will enter a reassignment order correcting the error. (Rudd, D.)
April 28, 2022 Notice to Counsel regarding: [1-1] Civil Cover Sheet, [1-2] Proposed Summons. Counsel is reminded that the filing user must lock or flatten the PDF document. Failure to flatten documents may result in the clerks office issuing a notice of deficiency. Counsel should "flatten" (the civil cover sheet and the proposed summons) prior to attaching it in accordance with Section IV.B of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. No other action is necessary. (Rudd, D.)
April 28, 2022 Notice to Counsel - Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
April 28, 2022 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Chad Sorrell, Christine Sorrell. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sorrell et al v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad Sorrell
Represented By: Ann C. Ochsner
Represented By: Lindsay S. Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Sorrell
Represented By: Ann C. Ochsner
Represented By: Lindsay S. Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?