Espin et al v. Citibank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Pablo Espin, Nicholas Padao, Jeremy Bell and Keith Taylor
Defendant: Citibank, N.A.
Case Number: 5:2022cv00383
Filed: September 22, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Referring Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
2 Judge: Robert T Numbers
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2022 Filing 13 Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Keith Taylor, Pablo Espin, Jeremy Bell, Nicholas Padao. All Defendants. (Puryear, Paul)
October 11, 2022 Filing 12 Notice of Appearance filed by Paul J Puryear, Jr on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Puryear, Paul)
September 26, 2022 Filing 11 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Claire E. Tonry on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Tonry, Claire)
September 26, 2022 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. At the direction of the Court and for the continued efficient administration of justice, this case is reassigned to United States District Judge Terrence W. Boyle for all further proceedings. United States District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan is no longer assigned to the case. All future filings should reflect the revised case number of 5:22-CV-383-BO. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 9/26/2022. (Hockaday, A.)
September 23, 2022 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Citibank, N.A. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Rudd, D.)
September 22, 2022 Filing 9 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Eric Knoll Lowney on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Lowney, Eric)
September 22, 2022 Filing 8 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Alyssa L. Koepfgen on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Koepfgen, Alyssa)
September 22, 2022 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by Matthew David Ballew on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Ballew, Matthew)
September 22, 2022 Filing 6 Notice of Related Case filed by Jeremy Bell, Pablo Espin, Nicholas Padao, Keith Taylor . (Ballew, Matthew)
September 22, 2022 Filing 5 Financial Disclosure Statement by Keith Taylor (Ballew, Matthew)
September 22, 2022 Filing 4 Financial Disclosure Statement by Jeremy Bell (Ballew, Matthew)
September 22, 2022 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by Pablo Espin (Ballew, Matthew)
September 22, 2022 Filing 2 Financial Disclosure Statement by Nicholas Padao (Ballew, Matthew)
September 22, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - Class Action (Jury Trial Demanded) against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCEDC-6742144.), filed by Keith Taylor, Pablo Espin, Jeremy Bell, Nicholas Padao. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Citibank, N.A.) (Ballew, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Espin et al v. Citibank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pablo Espin
Represented By: Alyssa L. Koepfgen
Represented By: Eric Knoll Lowney
Represented By: Matthew David Ballew
Represented By: Claire E. Tonry
Represented By: Paul J Puryear, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Padao
Represented By: Alyssa L. Koepfgen
Represented By: Eric Knoll Lowney
Represented By: Matthew David Ballew
Represented By: Claire E. Tonry
Represented By: Paul J Puryear, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Bell
Represented By: Alyssa L. Koepfgen
Represented By: Eric Knoll Lowney
Represented By: Matthew David Ballew
Represented By: Claire E. Tonry
Represented By: Paul J Puryear, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Taylor
Represented By: Alyssa L. Koepfgen
Represented By: Eric Knoll Lowney
Represented By: Matthew David Ballew
Represented By: Paul J Puryear, Jr
Represented By: Claire E. Tonry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citibank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?