Dunn Jr. v. Holden
Plaintiff: Rose Marie Edwards Baker R Dunn Jr.
Defendant: Rogene Earl Holden
Case Number: 5:2022cv00530
Filed: December 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Brian S Meyers
Referring Judge: Richard E Myers
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2023 Case Submitted to Chief US District Judge Richard E. Myers II regarding #4 Order to Show Cause. (McNally, Kimberly)
February 14, 2023 Filing 14 Document regarding car-truck collision, filed by Rose Marie Edwards Baker R Dunn Jr. (McNally, Kimberly)
February 8, 2023 Filing 13 Letter from Plaintiff to the Court - Case Status Request (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (McNally, Kimberly)
February 2, 2023 Filing 12 Letter from Plaintiff to the Court (Attachments: #1 Supplement) (McNally, Kimberly)
February 1, 2023 Filing 11 Document: Deed filed by Rose Marie Edwards Baker R Dunn Jr. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter) (McNally, Kimberly)
January 30, 2023 Filing 10 Letter from Plaintiff to the Court (McNally, Kimberly)
January 18, 2023 Filing 9 Letter from Plaintiff to the court. (Attachments: #1 Obituary, #2 Wake County Tax Documents) (McNally, Kimberly)
January 9, 2023 Filing 7 Document: Property Ownership Summary - Wake County CAMA System filed by Rose Marie Edwards Baker R Dunn Jr. (McNally, Kimberly)
January 6, 2023 Filing 6 Document: Obituary of Hattie P. Holden filed by Rose Marie Edwards Baker R Dunn Jr. (McNally, Kimberly)
January 6, 2023 Filing 5 Letter from Plaintiff with alternate phone number. (McNally, Kimberly)
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The court ORDERS Plaintiff to show cause in writing, on or before February 7, 2023; explaining why this court should not dismiss this action for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. Signed by Chief US District Judge Richard E. Myers II on 1/6/2023. (Copy of order sent to Rose Marie Edwards Baker R Dunn Jr., 2805 NC 97 Highway #205, Wendell, NC 27591 via US Mail.) (McNally, Kimberly)
December 28, 2022 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Rose Marie Edwards Baker R Dunn Jr. (Sellers, N.)
December 28, 2022 Filing 2 Notice of Self-Representation filed by Rose Marie Edwards Baker R Dunn Jr. (Sellers, N.)
December 28, 2022 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Rose Marie Edwards Baker R Dunn Jr. (Attachments: #1 Attachments to Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Complaint, #4 Attachment to Complaint, #5 Proposed Summons) (Sellers, N.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dunn Jr. v. Holden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose Marie Edwards Baker R Dunn Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rogene Earl Holden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?