United States of America v. Harris
Petitioner: United States of America
Respondent: Bryant Lamont Harris
Case Number: 5:2022hc02182
Filed: October 26, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 4241 Motion to Determine Mental Competency/Other Dist.
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Stay. Petitioner is DIRECTED to file notice regarding the competency determination within three days of the Eastern District of Louisiana's decision. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 12/22/2022. (Mann, Stephanie)
December 15, 2022 Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan regarding #5 MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Respondent's Competency to Stand Trial. (Mann, Stephanie)
November 16, 2022 Filing 8 Letter from Bryant Harris requesting that this matter be forwarded to Chief Judge of the United States District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Lopez, R.)
November 7, 2022 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by Sonya M. Allen on behalf of Bryant Lamont Harris. (Allen, Sonya)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - The Federal Public Defender is DIRECTED to provide representation in this action. Counsel for respondent is DIRECTED to file any necessary response to the #5 motion to stay within 21 days of this order. The government may file reply. The #4 motion to seal is granted. The court ORDERS that the parties file any future forensic evaluations or other psychological or psychiatric documents in this case under seal. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 11/4/2022. (Castania, M)
October 31, 2022 Motions Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan regarding #4 MOTION to Seal Document #3 PROPOSED SEALED Forensic Report, #5 MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Respondent's Competency to Stand Trial. (Castania, M)
October 26, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Respondent's Competency to Stand Trial filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Petre, Genna)
October 26, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION to Seal Document #3 PROPOSED SEALED Forensic Report filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Petre, Genna)
October 26, 2022 Filing 3 SEALED (Selected Participants Only)Forensic Report received as to Bryant Lamont Harris (available to: Respondent Bryant Lamont Harris, Petitioner United States of America). (Petre, Genna) Modified on 11/4/2022 (Castania, M).
October 26, 2022 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Genna D Petre on behalf of United States of America. (Petre, Genna)
October 26, 2022 Filing 1 Certificate of Mental Disease or Defect and Dangerousness Pursuant to 18 U.S.C. 4246(a) against Bryant Lamont Harris, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Mental Disease or Defect and Dangerousness, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Petre, Genna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: United States of America
Represented By: Genna D Petre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Bryant Lamont Harris
Represented By: Sonya M. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?