UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Johnson
Defendant: Philipp Johnson
Petitioner: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 5:2022hc02204
Filed: December 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard E Myers
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 4248 Civil Commitment of a Sexually Dangerous Person
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2023 Filing 15 SEALED (Selected Participants Only)Forensic Report received as to Philipp Johnson (available to: Defendant Philipp Johnson, Petitioner UNITED STATES OF AMERICA). (Attachments: #1 (Court Appointed Expert Report by Dr. Christopher North), #2 (Confidentiality Agreement for Dr. Christopher North), #3 (Curriculum Vitae for Dr. Christopher North)) (Anderson, Christopher) Modified on 1/31/2023 - to remove the word, "proposed."(Lopez, R.).
January 23, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION to Communicate Ex Parte with Respondent-Selected Expert filed by Philipp Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Costello, Halerie)
January 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appoint Expert Dr. Brian Abbott. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Swank on 1/9/2023. Counsel should read the order in its entirety for addition information and deadlines. A copy of the order sent to Dr. Abbott via US Mail. (Lopez, R.)
January 6, 2023 Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Swank regarding #12 MOTION to Appoint Expert Dr. Brian Abbott. (Lopez, R.)
January 5, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION to Appoint Expert Dr. Brian Abbott filed by Philipp Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Curriculum Vitae of Dr. Brian Abbott, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Costello, Halerie)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying #9 MOTION for Examination. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Swank on 12/20/2022. (Lopez, R.)
December 20, 2022 Response Referred to US Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Swank regarding #10 Response in Opposition. (Lopez, R.)
December 19, 2022 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition regarding #9 MOTION for Examination filed by Philipp Johnson. (Costello, Halerie)
December 19, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for Examination filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Ward, Merrill)
December 19, 2022 Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Swank regarding #9 MOTION for Examination . (Lopez, R.)
December 14, 2022 Filing 8 SEALED (Selected Participants Only)Forensic Report received as to Philipp Johnson (available to: Defendant Philipp Johnson, Petitioner UNITED STATES OF AMERICA). (Attachments: #1 Forensic Evaluation by Dr. Heather H. Ross, with the Sex Offender Certification Review Branch in FCC, Butner, #2 Curriculum Vitae for Dr. Heather H. Ross) (Anderson, Christopher) Modified on 12/14/2022 - to remove the word, "proposed." (Lopez, R.).
December 13, 2022 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by Halerie M. Costello on behalf of Philipp Johnson. (Costello, Halerie)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - The court hereby APPOINTS Christopher North, Ph.D., a licensed psychologist, as a mental health examiner pursuant to 18 U.S.C. 4247(b) and 4248(b) and 5(b) of Standing Order 13-SO-2. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Swank on 12/12/2022. Counsel is reminded to read the entire order for critical dates and deadlines. Copy of order sent to Dr. North via US Mail. (Lopez, R.)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - This case is a proceeding by the government under 18 U.S.C. 4248 for the civil commitment of Respondent as a sexually dangerous person. The court's Standing Order on such cases, No. 13-S0-2 (E.D.N.C. 21 Oct. 2013) (Standing Order), shall govern proceedings in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Swank on 12/12/2022. Counsel is reminded to read the entire order for critical dates and deadlines. (Lopez, R.)
December 6, 2022 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Michael D. Bredenberg on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Bredenberg, Michael)
December 6, 2022 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Merrill E Ward on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Ward, Merrill)
December 6, 2022 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Christopher M. Anderson on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Anderson, Christopher)
December 6, 2022 Filing 1 Certificate of a Sexually Dangerous Person against Philipp Johnson, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 (Certificate of a Sexually Dangerous Person by Dr. Jamie Hersant), #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Anderson, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Christopher M. Anderson
Represented By: Merrill E Ward
Represented By: Michael D. Bredenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philipp Johnson
Represented By: Halerie M. Costello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?