Miller v. Wilson
Plaintiff: John Frank Miller
Defendant: Ms. Wilson
Case Number: 5:2023ct03076
Filed: March 14, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr on 3/21/2023. Copy sent via US Mail. (Indig, A.)
March 21, 2023 Case Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan for initial review. (Indig, A.)
March 20, 2023 Filing 6 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement. (Indig, A.)
March 20, 2023 Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. regarding #2 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees. (Indig, A.)
March 17, 2023 Filing 5 TRUST FUND INFORMATION REQUESTED. (Indig, A.)
March 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order (Prison Litigation Reform Act). Response to Order due by 3/31/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 3/17/2023. Copy sent via US Mail. (Indig, A.)
March 14, 2023 Filing 3 Letter regarding case opening sent via US Mail to plaintiff. (Indig, A.)
March 14, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees filed by John Frank Miller. (Indig, A.)
March 14, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ms. Wilson filed by John Frank Miller. (Attachments: #1 Document in Support, #2 Envelope) (Indig, A.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Frank Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?