Whitehead v. Millis et al
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Whitehead
Defendant: David Millis, Capt. Garner, Lt. Nellusms, Sgt. Harris, Officer Cooper, Officer Johnson and Lt. Nellsums
Case Number: 5:2023ct03324
Filed: November 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Referring Judge: Robert B Jones
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2024 Filing 20 MOTION Relief Demand filed by Jeffrey Whitehead. (Attachments: #1 Document in Support, #2 Envelope) (Indig, A.)
January 12, 2024 Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding #20 MOTION Relief Demand. (Indig, A.)
January 10, 2024 Filing 19 MOTION Entry Judgment filed by Jeffrey Whitehead. (Indig, A.)
January 10, 2024 Filing 18 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Jeffrey Whitehead. (Attachments: #1 Documents in Support, #2 Envelope) (Indig, A.)
January 10, 2024 Motions Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever, III regarding #18 MOTION for Summary Judgment and #19 MOTION Entry Judgment. (Indig, A.)
January 2, 2024 Filing 17 Defendants Interrogatories filed by Jeffrey Whitehead. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Indig, A.)
December 27, 2023 Filing 16 Letter from Jeffrey Whitehead requesting US Marshal service forms. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Indig, A.)
December 11, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION to Consolidate Cases (and request for docket sheet) filed by Jeffrey Whitehead. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) Courtesy copy of docket sheet sent via US Mail. (Indig, A.)
December 11, 2023 Filing 14 Document: Additional Evidence filed by Jeffrey Whitehead. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Indig, A.)
December 11, 2023 Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding #15 MOTION to Consolidate Cases. (Indig, A.)
December 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER - GRANTING #11 Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 12/7/2023. Copy sent to plaintiff via US Mail. (Indig, A.)
December 7, 2023 Filing 12 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement. (Indig, A.)
December 7, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees filed by Jeffrey Whitehead. (Indig, A.)
December 7, 2023 Filing 10 CORRECTED COMPLAINT (on the form) against Officer Cooper, Capt. Garner, Sgt. Harris, Officer Johnson, David Millis and Lt. Nellsums filed by Jeffrey Whitehead. (Attachments: #1 Documents in Support, #2 Envelope) (Indig, A.)
December 7, 2023 Filing 9 Document: Incident/Evidence Retaliation Act filed by Jeffrey Whitehead. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Indig, A.)
December 7, 2023 Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. regarding #11 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees. (Indig, A.)
December 7, 2023 Motions Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding #6 MOTION Discrimination, Retaliation Act "Days of Punishment" Entered and #8 MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint. Case also submitted for initial review (Indig, A.)
December 6, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION to Amend Add to Claim #1 Complaint filed by Jeffrey Whitehead. (Attachments: #1 Documents in Support, #2 Envelope) (Indig, A.)
November 29, 2023 Filing 7 Statement of Relief Demand Claim: Discrimination, Retaliation Act, 1983 Deliberate Indifference filed by Jeffrey Whitehead. (Attachment: #1 Documents in Support) (Indig, A.)
November 29, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION Discrimination, Retaliation Act "Days of Punishment" Entered filed by Jeffrey Whitehead. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Indig, A.)
November 29, 2023 Filing 5 Statement of Demand Relief filed by Jeffrey Whitehead. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Indig, A.)
November 29, 2023 Filing 4 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement. (Indig, A.)
November 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER of Deficiency. The complaint is not on the forms prescribed for use by this court AND you must either file an application to proceed without prepayment of fees and affidavit or pay $402.00. Responses due by 12/13/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 11/22/2023. Copy of order and forms sent to plaintiff via US Mail. (Indig, A.)
November 21, 2023 Filing 2 Letter regarding case opening sent via US Mail to plaintiff. (Indig, A.)
November 21, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Officer Cooper, Capt. Garner, Sgt. Harris, Officer Johnson, David Millis and Lt. Nellusms filed by Jeffrey Whitehead. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Demand Relief, #2 Documents in Support, #3 Envelope) (Indig, A.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whitehead v. Millis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Whitehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Millis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capt. Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Nellusms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Nellsums
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?