McNeill v. State of North Carolina et al
Plaintiff: Anthony D. McNeill
Defendant: State of North Carolina, North Carolina State Bar, John A. Mandulak, Hannah Hein, Davis Puryear, Hutchens Law Firm, Nationstar Mortgage LLC Mortgage Servicer, d/b/a Mr. Cooper, Substitute Trustee Services, Inc., L. W. Blake and Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC
Case Number: 5:2023cv00003
Filed: January 5, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 2, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2023 Filing 39 RESPONSE in Opposition regarding #32 MOTION to Strike Filed by Plaintiff filed by L. W. Blake, Hannah Hein, Hutchens Law Firm, Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC, John A. Mandulak, Nationstar Mortgage LLC, Davis Puryear, Substitute Trustee Services, Inc.. (Puryear, Davis)
March 2, 2023 Filing 38 Memorandum in Support regarding #37 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1)First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by L. W. Blake, Hannah Hein, Hutchens Law Firm, Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC, John A. Mandulak, Nationstar Mortgage LLC, Davis Puryear, Substitute Trustee Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1) (Puryear, Davis)
March 2, 2023 Filing 37 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1), First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by L. W. Blake, Hannah Hein, Hutchens Law Firm, Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC, John A. Mandulak, Nationstar Mortgage LLC, Davis Puryear, Substitute Trustee Services, Inc.. (Puryear, Davis)
March 2, 2023 Filing 36 Financial Disclosure Statement by Nationstar Mortgage LLC identifying Corporate Parent Nationstar Sub1 LLC, Corporate Parent Nationstar Sub2 LLC, Corporate Parent Mr. Cooper Group Inc., Corporate Parent Blackrock Inc., Corporate Parent The Vangard Group Inc. for Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Puryear, Davis)
March 2, 2023 Filing 35 Financial Disclosure Statement by Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Bayview MSR Opportunity Corp. for Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC. (Puryear, Davis)
February 28, 2023 Filing 34 Memorandum in Support regarding #33 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by North Carolina State Bar, State of North Carolina. (Bulleri, Michael)
February 28, 2023 Filing 33 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by North Carolina State Bar, State of North Carolina. (Bulleri, Michael)
February 10, 2023 STANDING ORDER 18-SO-5 provided as a courtesy to all parties as well as located on this court's website. Standing Order 18-SO-5 provides: (1) unless otherwise required by law, a document submitted for filing by an unrepresented litigant shall be deemed filed on the date it is received by the clerk;(2) where the clerk scans and electronically files documents on behalf of a unrepresented litigant, the NEF constitutes service on registered users of record in the case pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(b)(2)(E) and Fed. R. Crim. P. 49(a)(3)(A), and therefore additional service by other means is not required; (3) the deadline to respond to any document electronically filed by the clerk's office on behalf of an unrepresented litigant will be calculated from the date of the NEF; and(4) all litigants still must serve any non-registered users in the case pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(b) or Fed. R. Crim. P. 49(a) and file a certificate of service as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(d)(l)(B) and Fed. R. Crim. P. 49(b)(l). (Collins, S.)
February 8, 2023 Filing 32 MOTION to Strike Defendant "Notice of Appearance" from the Record, a Corporation Cannot Represent Itself in Court filed by Anthony D. McNeill. (Collins, S.)
February 8, 2023 Filing 31 EXHIBIT LIST by Anthony D. McNeill. (Attachments: #1 Attorney Notice of Appearance, #2 Attorney listed in civil complaint, #3 Attorney named as defendant, #4 Defendant's motion for extension of time to respond, #5 Priority envelope, #6 Envelope) (Collins, S.)
February 8, 2023 Filing 30 Document: Plaintiff's Request for Jury Trial filed by Anthony D. McNeill. (Collins, S.)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer regarding regarding #1 Complaint. North Carolina State Bar and State of North Carolina answer due 3/17/2023. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 2/3/2023. A copy of this Order was sent via US mail to Anthony D. McNeill at 3631 Windsock Court, Eastover, NC 28312 (Collins, S.)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer regarding #1 Complaint. L. W. Blake, Hannah Hein, utchens Law Firm, Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC, John A. Mandulak, Nationstar Mortgage LLC, Davis Puryear and Substitute Trustee Services, Inc. answer due 3/2/2023. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 2/3/2023. A copy of this Order was sent via US mail to Anthony D. McNeill at 3631 Windsock Court, Eastover, NC 28312 (Collins, S.)
February 3, 2023 Filing 27 Financial Disclosure Statement by Substitute Trustee Services, Inc. (Puryear, Davis)
February 3, 2023 Filing 26 Financial Disclosure Statement by Davis Puryear (Puryear, Davis)
February 3, 2023 Filing 25 Financial Disclosure Statement by John A. Mandulak (Puryear, Davis)
February 3, 2023 Filing 24 Financial Disclosure Statement by L. W. Blake (Puryear, Davis)
February 3, 2023 Filing 23 Financial Disclosure Statement by Hutchens Law Firm (Puryear, Davis)
February 3, 2023 Filing 22 Financial Disclosure Statement by Hannah Hein (Puryear, Davis)
February 3, 2023 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to L. W. Blake, Hannah Hein, Hutchens Law Firm, Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC, John A. Mandulak, Nationstar Mortgage LLC, Davis Puryear, Substitute Trustee Services, Inc.. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Collins, S.)
February 3, 2023 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #6 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint. (Collins, S.)
February 1, 2023 Filing 21 Document: Reserve the Right to Amend filed by Anthony D. McNeill. (Collins, S.)
February 1, 2023 Filing 20 Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint filed by Anthony D. McNeill served on Substitute Trustee Services, Inc. on 1/12/23. (Collins, S.)
February 1, 2023 Filing 19 Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint filed by Anthony D. McNeill served on State of North Carolina on 1/18/23. (Collins, S.)
February 1, 2023 Filing 18 Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint filed by Anthony D. McNeill served on North Carolina State Bar on 1/17/23. (Collins, S.)
February 1, 2023 Filing 17 Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint filed by Anthony D. McNeill served on Lakeview Loan Servicing LLC on 1/14/23. (Collins, S.)
February 1, 2023 Filing 16 Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint filed by Anthony D. McNeill served on L.W. Blake on 1/12/23. (Collins, S.)
February 1, 2023 Filing 15 Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint filed by Anthony D. McNeill served on Johan Mandulak on 1/12/23. (Collins, S.)
February 1, 2023 Filing 14 Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint filed by Anthony D. McNeill served on Hutchens Law Firm on 1/12/23. (Collins, S.)
February 1, 2023 Filing 13 Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint filed by Anthony D. McNeill served on Hannah Hein on 1/12/23. (Collins, S.)
February 1, 2023 Filing 12 Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint filed by Anthony D. McNeill served on Davis Puryear on 1/12/23. (Collins, S.)
February 1, 2023 Filing 11 Document: Lis Pendens Notice to Clerk of Court of Cumberland County filed by Anthony D. McNeill. (Attachments: #1 Outer express envelope, #2 Envelope) (Collins, S.)
January 31, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint,, filed by North Carolina State Bar, State of North Carolina. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Bulleri, Michael)
January 31, 2023 Filing 9 Financial Disclosure Statement by State of North Carolina (Bulleri, Michael)
January 31, 2023 Filing 8 Financial Disclosure Statement by North Carolina State Bar (Bulleri, Michael)
January 31, 2023 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by Michael Elmer Bulleri on behalf of North Carolina State Bar, State of North Carolina. (Bulleri, Michael)
January 30, 2023 Filing 6 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by L. W. Blake, Hannah Hein, Hutchens Law Firm, Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC, John A. Mandulak, Nationstar Mortgage LLC, Davis Puryear, Substitute Trustee Services, Inc.. (Puryear, Davis)
January 30, 2023 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Davis Wright Puryear on behalf of L. W. Blake, Hannah Hein, Hutchens Law Firm, Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC, John A. Mandulak, Nationstar Mortgage LLC, Davis Puryear, Substitute Trustee Services, Inc.. (Puryear, Davis)
January 5, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to L. W. Blake, Hannah Hein, Hutchens Law Firm, John A. Mandulak, Nationstar Mortgage LLC, North Carolina State Bar, Davis Puryear, State of North Carolina, Substitute Trustee Services, Inc., Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC (Summons issued at intake) (Rudd, D.) Modified on 1/11/2023 to include Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC. (Rudd, D.)
January 5, 2023 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Anthony D. McNeill. (Rudd, D.)
January 5, 2023 Filing 2 Notice of Self-Representation filed by Anthony D. McNeill. (Rudd, D.)
January 5, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402.00 receipt number 500001404.), filed by Anthony D. McNeill. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Plaintiff, Anthony D. McNeill, #2 Index of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit 1- Alleged Transfer and Assignment, #4 Exhibit 2- Foreclosure of Deed of Trust, #5 Exhibit 3- Notice of Dispute, #6 Exhibit 4- Motion to Strike Foreclosure Proceedings, #7 Exhibit 5- Motion for Default by Non-Creditor, #8 Exhibit 6- Affidavit of Mailing Notice of Rescission, #9 Exhibit 7- Time Barred - Allege debt was not verified, #10 Exhibit 8- Order to Proceed with Foreclosure, #11 Civil Cover Sheet) (Rudd, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McNeill v. State of North Carolina et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony D. McNeill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of North Carolina
Represented By: Michael Elmer Bulleri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Carolina State Bar
Represented By: Michael Elmer Bulleri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John A. Mandulak
Represented By: Davis Wright Puryear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hannah Hein
Represented By: Davis Wright Puryear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davis Puryear
Represented By: Davis Wright Puryear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hutchens Law Firm
Represented By: Davis Wright Puryear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC Mortgage Servicer, d/b/a Mr. Cooper
Represented By: Davis Wright Puryear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Substitute Trustee Services, Inc.
Represented By: Davis Wright Puryear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. W. Blake
Represented By: Davis Wright Puryear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Davis Wright Puryear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?