Wagner et al v. Norcold, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Dan Wagner and Phyllis Cheeseman
Defendant: Norcold, Inc., Thetford Corporation and The Dyson-Kissner-Moran Corporation
Case Number: 5:2023cv00087
Filed: February 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Referring Judge: Robert B Jones
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2023 Filing 16 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Mitchell R. Powell on behalf of Norcold, Inc., The Dyson-Kissner-Moran Corporation, Thetford Corporation. (Powell, Mitchell)
April 13, 2023 Filing 15 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by John Parker Fauntleroy on behalf of Norcold, Inc., The Dyson-Kissner-Moran Corporation, Thetford Corporation. (Fauntleroy, John)
April 13, 2023 Filing 14 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Todd M. Foss on behalf of Norcold, Inc., The Dyson-Kissner-Moran Corporation, Thetford Corporation. (Foss, Todd)
March 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER FOR DISCOVERY PLAN sent to all parties. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 3/22/2023. (Mann, Stephanie)
March 20, 2023 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by The Dyson-Kissner-Moran Corporation. (Malik, Georgia)
March 20, 2023 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Thetford Corporation. (Malik, Georgia)
March 20, 2023 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Norcold, Inc.. (Malik, Georgia)
March 20, 2023 Filing 9 Financial Disclosure Statement by The Dyson-Kissner-Moran Corporation (Malik, Georgia)
March 20, 2023 Filing 8 Financial Disclosure Statement by Thetford Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Yosemite Acquisition Corporation for Thetford Corporation. (Malik, Georgia)
March 20, 2023 Filing 7 Financial Disclosure Statement by Norcold, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Thetford LLC, Corporate Parent Yosemite Acquisition Corporation for Norcold, Inc.. (Malik, Georgia)
March 20, 2023 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Georgia Hezain Malik on behalf of Norcold, Inc., The Dyson-Kissner-Moran Corporation, Thetford Corporation. (Malik, Georgia)
March 6, 2023 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Mann, Stephanie)
February 24, 2023 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Norcold, Inc., The Dyson-Kissner-Moran Corporation, Thetford Corporation. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Rudd, D.)
February 21, 2023 Filing 4 Financial Disclosure Statement by Phyllis Cheeseman (Wallace, Patrick)
February 21, 2023 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by Dan Wagner (Wallace, Patrick)
February 21, 2023 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Patrick M. Wallace on behalf of Phyllis Cheeseman, Dan Wagner. (Wallace, Patrick)
February 21, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Norcold, Inc., The Dyson-Kissner-Moran Corporation, Thetford Corporation ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCEDC-6955871.), filed by Dan Wagner, Phyllis Cheeseman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons) (Wallace, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wagner et al v. Norcold, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan Wagner
Represented By: Patrick M. Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phyllis Cheeseman
Represented By: Patrick M. Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norcold, Inc.
Represented By: Mitchell R. Powell
Represented By: Georgia Hezain Malik
Represented By: John Parker Fauntleroy
Represented By: Todd M. Foss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thetford Corporation
Represented By: Todd M. Foss
Represented By: Mitchell R. Powell
Represented By: Georgia Hezain Malik
Represented By: John Parker Fauntleroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Dyson-Kissner-Moran Corporation
Represented By: Georgia Hezain Malik
Represented By: John Parker Fauntleroy
Represented By: Todd M. Foss
Represented By: Mitchell R. Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?