United States of America v. Mair
Petitioner: United States of America
Respondent: Sherod H. Mair
Case Number: 5:2023hc02010
Filed: January 18, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 4241 Motion to Determine Mental Competency/Other Dist.
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - At the direction of the Court and for the continued efficient administration of justice, the above captioned case is reassigned to the below noted case number. All future pleadings should reflect the revised case number of: 5:23-HC-2010-FL. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 1/18/2023. (Indig, A.)
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Motion for challenge hearing and appointment of independent examiner as to Sherod H. Mair. The request for a hearing is DENIED without prejudice. The request for appointment of an independent examiner is GRANTED. The clerk shall change this action to an "HC" case. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 1/13/2023. (Indig, A.)
December 21, 2022 Filing 4 RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Sherod H. Mair regarding MOTION for Challenge Hearing and for the appointment of Dr. Hans Stelmach filed by United States of America. (Indig, A.)
December 2, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Challenge Hearing and for the appointment of Dr. Hans Stelmach filed by Sherod H. Mair. (Indig, A.)
October 12, 2022 Filing 2 SEALED (Selected Participants Only)Forensic Report (available to: Respondent Sherod H. Mair, Petitioner United States of America). (Indig, A.)
September 27, 2022 Filing 1 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. At the direction of the Court, the case as to Sherod H. Mair is reassigned to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan for all further proceedings. Senior Judge W. Earl Britt no longer assigned to the case. All future filings shall reflect the revised case number of 5:99-MJ-210-1FL. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on September 27, 2022. (Indig, A.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Mair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: United States of America
Represented By: Jennifer D Dannels
Represented By: Genna D Petre
Represented By: Robert J. Dodson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sherod H. Mair
Represented By: G. Alan DuBois
Represented By: Jane E. Pearce
Represented By: Joseph L. Ross, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?