Hodge v. Cook
Plaintiff: Michael Joseph Hodge
Defendant: Dr. Patrick Cook
Case Number: 5:2024ct03104
Filed: May 2, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Referring Judge: Robert B Jones
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Detainee: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question: Bivens Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2024 Filing 6 CLERK'S JUDGMENT - that this action is hereby dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 6/18/2024. Copy of judgment and notice of appellate rights sent via US Mail to Michael Joseph Hodge at Butner Medium I - F.C.I. (Indig, A.)
June 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Dismissing Case without prejudice. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 6/18/2024. Copy sent to plaintiff via US Mail. (Indig, A.)
June 12, 2024 Case Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding order of deficiency. (Indig, A.)
May 15, 2024 Filing 4 Letter in Support regarding #1 Complaint filed by Michael Joseph Hodge. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Indig, A.)
May 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER of Deficiency. The complaint is not on the forms prescribed for use by this court AND you must either file an application to proceed without prepayment of fees and affidavit or pay $405.00. Responses due by 6/3/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 5/13/2024. Copy of order and forms sent to plaintiff via US Mail. (Indig, A.)
May 2, 2024 Filing 2 Letter to plaintiff regarding filing of complaint and enclosing notice regarding privacy issues. (Castania, M)
May 2, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (in letter form) against Patrick Cook, filed by Michael Joseph Hodge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope) (Castania, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hodge v. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Joseph Hodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Patrick Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?