Davis et al v. Ratledge et al
Plaintiff: Michael Scott Davis and Stetson Mansfield Webster
Defendant: Julie Bell, Jennifer Bedford, Brian Ratledge and Damion McCullers
Case Number: 5:2024cv00440
Filed: July 30, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. § 1981 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants shall have up to and including October 21, 2024, to answer or otherwise plead to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 9/20/2024. (Pro se parties have consented to receiving electronic service of all motions, notices, orders, and documents in civil cases in the Eastern District of North Carolina.) (Carter, Alexus)
September 19, 2024 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #21 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 Amended Complaint, Notice of Deficiency. (Collins, S)
September 18, 2024 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Complaint and Memorandum of Law filed by Michael Scott Davis, Stetson Mansfield Webster. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent to file motion by Attorney Carreiro, #2 Proposed Supplemental Complaint, #3 Memorandum of Law in Support of Supplemental Complaint for Civil Rights) (Collins, S)
September 11, 2024 Filing 21 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer as to #8 Amended Complaint, Notice of Deficiency, filed by Jennifer Bedford, Julie Bell, Damion McCullers, Brian Ratledge. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Agosto Carreiro, Chris) Modified on 9/19/2024 to change filing event and revise docket text. (Collins, S).
September 11, 2024 Filing 20 Document: Conditional Agreement regarding #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer filed by Michael Scott Davis, Stetson Mansfield Webster. (Collins, S)
September 11, 2024 Filing 19 Affidavit of Service for Summons filed by Stetson Mansfield Webster served on Judge Julie Bell on 9/5/24. (Collins, S)
September 11, 2024 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #8 Amended Complaint. (Collins, S)
September 11, 2024 Notice of Pro Se E-Noticing - Pro se parties Michael Scott Davis and Stetson Mansfield Webster has consented to receiving electronic service of all motions, notices, orders, and documents in civil cases in the Eastern District of North Carolina. All documents filed in CM-ECF will be served on this party via email pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 5.1. (Collins, S)
September 5, 2024 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 6.1, a motion for extension of time must reflect the view of each opposing party, excluding incarcerated unrepresented parties, or the efforts to consult with any opposing parties to obtain their view. Counsel is directed to refile. (Collins, S)
September 4, 2024 Filing 18 Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint filed by Stetson Mansfield Webster served on Judge Brian Ratledge on 8/13/24. (Collins, S)
September 4, 2024 Filing 17 Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint filed by Stetson Mansfield Webster served on Judge Damion McCullers on 8/9/24. (Collins, S)
September 4, 2024 Filing 16 Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint filed by Stetson Mansfield Webster served on Judge Julie Bell on 8/13/24. (Collins, S)
September 4, 2024 Filing 15 Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint filed by Stetson Mansfield Webster served on Judge Jennifer Bedford on 8/9/24. (Collins, S)
September 4, 2024 Filing 14 Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint filed by Stetson Mansfield Webster served on NC Attorney General on 8/12/24. (Collins, S)
September 4, 2024 Filing 13 Affidavit of Service filed by Stetson Mansfield Webster. (Attachments: #1 Documents in support) (Collins, S)
August 29, 2024 Filing 12 **Amended at #21 ** MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #8 Amended Complaint filed by Jennifer Bedford, Julie Bell, Damion McCullers, Brian Ratledge. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Agosto Carreiro, Chris) Modified on 9/19/2024 (Collins, S).
August 29, 2024 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance filed by Chris D. Agosto Carreiro on behalf of All Defendants. (Agosto Carreiro, Chris)
August 22, 2024 Filing 10 Summons Reissued as to Jennifer Bedford, Julie Bell, Damion McCullers, Brian Ratledge. (Summons reissued at Intake counter) (Collins, S)
August 20, 2024 Filing 9 Memorandum in Support regarding #8 Amended Complaint filed by Michael Scott Davis, Stetson Mansfield Webster. (Collins, S)
August 20, 2024 Filing 8 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Jennifer Bedford, Julie Bell, Damion McCullers, Brian Ratledge filed by Michael Scott Davis, Stetson Mansfield Webster. (Collins, S) Modified on 8/21/2024 (Collins, S).
August 20, 2024 Filing 7 SECOND COMPLAINT against Julie Bell, Damion McCullers, Brian Ratledge filed by Michael Scott Davis, Stetson Mansfield Webster. (Collins, S)
July 30, 2024 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Jennifer Bedford, Julie Bell, Damion McCullers, Brian Ratledge. (Summonses issued at intake) (Rudd, D.)
July 30, 2024 Filing 5 Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Stetson Mansfield Webster. (Rudd, D.)
July 30, 2024 Filing 4 Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Michael Scott Davis. (Rudd, D.)
July 30, 2024 Filing 3 Notice of Self-Representation filed by Stetson Mansfield Webster. (Rudd, D.)
July 30, 2024 Filing 2 Notice of Self-Representation filed by Michael Scott Davis. (Rudd, D.)
July 30, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for False Imprisonment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1367 against All Defendants (Filing fee $405.00 receipt number 5-00011794), filed by Michael Scott Davis, Stetson Mansfield Webster. (Attachments: #1 Complaint for Violation of Civil Rights pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1983, #2 Exhibit 1- of Michael S. Davis - Copy of Opinion from the North Carolina Court of Appeals (Case No. COA22-1053, COA22-1054), #3 Exhibit 2- of Michael S. Davis - Copy of Permanent Custody Order in (Wake Co. Case No. 14-CVD-15242), #4 Exhibit 3- of Michael S. Davis - Copy of Plaintiff's Appellant's Brief, #5 Exhibit 4- of Michael S. Davis - Copy of Transcript dated 3/2/22 from (Wake Co. Case No. 14-CVD-15242), #6 Exhibit 5- of Michael S. Davis - Copy of Motion for Relief from Judgment/Order in (Wake County Case No. 14-CVS-15242), #7 Exhibit 6- Copy of Motion for Modification of Child Support Order (Wake County Case No. 14-CVD-15242), #8 Exhibit 7- Copy of Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Terminate Child Support and Order Modifying Child Support in (Wake County Case No. 14-CVD-15242), #9 Exhibit 8- of Michael S. Davis - Copy of Affidavit of Records Custodian Producing Subpoenaed Records, #10 Exhibit 9- of Michael S. Davis - Copy of Plaintiff-Appellant's Brief, #11 Exhibit 10- of Michael S. Davis - Copy of Transcript from plaintiff's motion for sanctions dated 4/26/22, #12 Exhibit 11- of Michael S. Davis - Copy of motion for sanctions in (Wake County Case No. 14-CVD-15242), #13 Exhibit 11A- of Michael S. Davis - Pltf's motion for leave to file first amended complaint, #14 Exhibit 12- Copy of Letter dated 12/11/14 to Michael S. Davis, #15 Exhibit 13- of Michael S. Davis of Non-Timely Notification, #16 Exhibit 14- of Michael S. Davis - Court's order dated 4/22/18, #17 Exhibit 14A- of Michael S. Davis - Copy of motion for the court to issue findings of fact and motion to recuse, #18 Exhibit 15- of Michael S. Davis - Copy of petition, #19 Exhibit 16- of Michael S. Davis - Copy of Transcript dated 10/7/22, #20 Exhibit 17- of Michael S. Davis - Copy of Conditions of Release and Release Order, #21 Exhibit 18- of Michael S. Davis - Copy of transcript dated 10/6/23, #22 Exhibit 19- of Michael S. Davis - Copy of Order for Civil Contempt from (Wake County Case No. 14-CVD-15242), #23 Exhibit 20- of Michael S. Davis - Court supervision of payments to defendant & request for escrow or suitable alternative, #24 Exhibit 21- of Michael S. Davis - Motion for expedited relief from judgment or order, #25 Exhibit 22- of Michael S. Davis - Copy of order from the Supreme Court of North Carolina, #26 Exhibit 23- of Michael S. Davis - Correspondence from Michael S. Davis and the North Carolina Judicial Standards Commission, #27 Exhibit 24- of Michael S. Davis - Order from the North Carolina Court of Appeals dated 4/23/24, #28 Exhibit 25- of Michael S. Davis - Plaintiff's Petition for discretionary review filed with the North Carolina Supreme Court, #29 Exhibit 26- of Michael S. Davis, #30 Exhibit 1- of Stetson M. Webster - Amended order on post-separation support, permanent child support and attorney fees, #31 Exhibit 2- of Stetson Webster - Copy of order for civil contempt in (Wake County Case No. 19-CVD-17523), #32 Exhibit 3- of Stetson Webster - Copy of Rule 29 motion to reconsider judgment for civil contempt in (Wake County Case No. 19-CVD-17523), #33 Exhibit 4- of Stetson Webster - Copy of Rule 62 motion to stay judgment for civil contempt in (Wake County Case No. 19-CVD-17523), #34 Exhibit 5- of Stetson Webster - Requested Expedited relief from judgment and motion to reconsider, #35 Exhibit 6- of Stetson Webster - Order from the North Carolina Court of Appeals in (Wake County Case No. 19-CVD-17523), #36 Exhibit 7- of Stetson Webster - Order from the North Carolina Court of Appeals in (Wake County Case No. 19-CVD-17523), #37 Exhibit 8- of Stetson Webster - Opinion from the North Carolina Court of Appeals in (Wake County Case No. 19-CVD-15723), #38 Exhibit 9- of Stetson Webster - Motion to Expedite dated 11/1/21 from (Wake County Case No. 19-CVD-15723), #39 Exhibit 10- of Stetson Webster - Motion to finalize eleven (11) pending orders without further hearing in (Wake County Case No. 19-CVD-15723), #40 Exhibit 11- of Stetson Webster - Copy of Petition for writ of mandamus under Rule 22 of the North Carolina Rules of Appellate Procedure, #41 Exhibit 12- of Stetson Webster - Copy of Order from the North Carolina Court of Appeals in (Wake County Case No. 19-CVD-15723), #42 Exhibit 13- of Stetson Webster - Protective Order for information contained on a hard drive in (Wake County Case No. 19-CVD-15723), #43 Exhibit 13A- of Order regarding plaintiff's motion to compel the hard drive in (Wake County Case No. 19-CVD-15723), #44 Exhibit 14- of Stetson Webster - Motion for status update on defendant's compliance in (Wake County Case No. 19-CVD-15723), #45 Exhibit 15- of Stetson Webster - Temporary custody order in (Wake County Case No. 19-CVD-15723), #46 Exhibit 16- of Stetson Webster - Petition for Writ of Certiorari filed in the North Carolina Court of Appeals in (Wake County Case No. 19-CVD-15723), #47 Exhibit 17- of Stetson Webster - North Carolina Court of Appeals opinion dated 3/5/24, #48 Exhibit 18A- of Stetson Webster - Transcript dated 12/7/21 in (Wake County Case No. 19-CVD-15723), #49 Exhibit 18B- of Stetson Webster - Volume 2 of Transcript dated 12/8/21 in (Wake County Case No. 19-CVD-15723), #50 Exhibit 19- of Stetson Webster - Order for equitable distribution in (Wake County Case No. 19-CVD-15723), #51 Exhibit 20- of Stetson Webster - Opinion from the North Carolina Court of Appeals dated 3/5/24, #52 Exhibit 21- of Stetson Webster - Email correspondence, #53 Exhibit 22- of Stetson Webster - Order continuing pltf's motion to show cause due to pending appeal in (Wake County Case No. 19-CVD-15723), #54 Exhibit 23- of Stetson Webster - Gatekeeper order in (Wake County Case No. 19-CVD-15723), #55 Exhibit 24- of Stetson Webster - Amended petition for writ of certiorari under Rule 21 filed with the North Carolina Court of Appeals, #56 Exhibit 25- of Stetson Webster - Order from the North Carolina Court of Appeals dated 6/14/2023, #57 Exhibit 26- of Stetson Webster - Letter to the North Carolina Judicial Standards Commission dated 11/30/21, #58 Exhibit 27- of Stetson Webster - Rules from the Tenth Judicial District - Family Court Rules for Domestic Court, #59 Exhibit Memorandum of Law in Support of Complaint for Civil Rights Violations under 42 U.S.C. 1983, #60 Civil Cover Sheet Signed by Michael S. Davis, #61 Civil Cover Sheet Signed by Stetson M. Webster) (Rudd, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis et al v. Ratledge et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Bell
Represented By: Chris D. Agosto Carreiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Bedford
Represented By: Chris D. Agosto Carreiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Ratledge
Represented By: Chris D. Agosto Carreiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Damion McCullers
Represented By: Chris D. Agosto Carreiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Scott Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stetson Mansfield Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?