Davis v. Walker, et al
Case Number: 7:1998cv00116
Filed: February 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Southern Division Office
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER denying 131 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever, III on 7/14/2021. Copy sent via US Mail to Robert L. Davis at 40 Kensington Street, Lumberton, NC 28358. (Stouch, L.)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER denying 128 Motion for Recusal; denying 129 Motion enter order upon the reassigned lawsuit with finding of fact and conclusions of law under federal rule 52. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 6/7/2021. Sent to Robert L. Davis at 40 Kensington Street Lumberton, NC 28358 via US Mail. (Sellers, N.)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER denying 124 Motion to Strike. The motion is baseless and is DENIED. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 2/6/2019. Sent to Robert L. Davis at 40 Kensington Street Lumberton, NC 28358 via US Mail. (Sellers, N.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Walker, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?