McCartney v. Benton

Plaintiff: Devon Tyler McCartney
Defendant: Dempsey Benton
Case Number: 7:2008cv00057
Filed: April 7, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Civil Rights: Welfare Office
County: ROBESON
Presiding Judge: Malcolm J. Howard
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting 80 Motion to Stay. For good cause shown and upon the joint motion of the parties, IT IS ORDERED that the stay entered in this case on September 28, 2010 shall continue, and all discovery and other proceedings in this litigation shall be STAYED through October 13, 2010. Signed by Senior Judge Malcolm J. Howard on 10/13/2010. (Heath, D.)
September 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting 78 Motion to Continue Stay. IT IS ORDERED that the stay entered in this case on August 24, 2010 shall continue, and all discovery and other proceedings in this litigation shall be STAYED for a period of 15 additional days, through October 8, 2010. Signed by Senior Judge Malcolm J. Howard on 9/28/2010. (Heath, D.)
August 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER granting 75 Motion to Stay. It is ordered that all discovery and other proceedings in the litigation be STAYED for a period of 30 days from the date of this order. Signed by Senior Judge Malcolm J. Howard on 8/24/2010. (Heath, D.)
July 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting 58 Motion for Extension of Time to File; denying 59 Motion to Strike and granting 61 Motion for Leave to File. See Order for details. Signed by USMJ William A. Webb on 7/13/2010. (Heath, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCartney v. Benton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devon Tyler McCartney
Represented By: Sarah Jane Somers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dempsey Benton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?