Taylor v. Astrue

Plaintiff: Juanita Bozeman Taylor
Defendant: Michael J Astrue
Case Number: 7:2010cv00149
Filed: July 29, 2010
Court: North Carolina Eastern District Court
Office: Southern Division Office
County: NEWHANOVER
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 2, 2014 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 39 Consent Motion for Attorney Fees under Sec. 406(b) - Plaintiff's counsel's motion for approval of attorney's fees is ALLOWED in the full amount requested of $15,005.25. Defendant shall release to plaint iff'scounsel the sum of $15,005.25 as attorney's fees for services rendered before this court. Counsel shall refund to plaintiff $4,500.00, the amount awarded pursuant to EAJA. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 5/1/2014. (Tripp, S.)
September 21, 2011 38 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT ORDER granting 37 Motion for Attorney Fees - Signed by Chief Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 09/21/2011. (Baker, C.)
July 11, 2011 36 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED in accordance with the court's order entered July 7, 2011, and for the reasons set forth more specifically therein, that plaintiff's motion for judgment on the pleadings is granted and defendant's motion for judgment on the pleadings is denied. This case is remanded to the Commissioner for further proceedings consistent with the court's July 7, 2011 order. Signed by Dennis P. Iavarone, Clerk of Court on 07/11/2011. (Baker, C.)
July 7, 2011 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 32 Memorandum and Recommendations; granting 27 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; and, denying 30 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings - The court concludes that the ALJ's faultycredibility determination and his f ailure to consider the decision of the NCDHHS require remand of this matter. This matter is REMANDED to the Commissioner for further proceedings consistent with this order. The Clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by Chief Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 07/07/2011. (Baker, C.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juanita Bozeman Taylor
Represented By: James B. Gillespie, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?