Macon v. Astrue
Plaintiff: Anthony Macon
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 7:2011cv00049
Filed: February 16, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Southern Division Office
County: COLUMBUS
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:402
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees - Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 11/2/2018. (Tripp, S.)
November 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting 19 PETITION for Attorney Fees - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 11/08/2011. (Baker, C.)
September 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED in accordance with the court's order entered September 19, 2011, that defendant's motion to remand is granted and the Commissioner's decision is reversed. This matter is remanded to the Social Security Administration pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g) and 1383(c)(3) for further proceedings, including a new hearing. Signed by Dennis P. Iavarone, Clerk of Court on 09/19/2011. (Baker, C.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Macon v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Macon
Represented By: Barbara von Euler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?