Howard v. Caddell Construction Company, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Rickey Howard
Defendant: Caddell Construction Company, Inc., W.G. Yates & Sons Construction Company, Pompano Masonry Corporation, Breslow Construction, LLC, David J. Valdini & Associates, P.A., Seitlin & Company, Julian Marie Breslow, Stephen Jay Siegel, Cleetus McHenry, Joseph Canitano, David J. Valdini, Dale A. Belis and Jillian Breslow Phelps
Case Number: 7:2011cv00270
Filed: December 22, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Southern Division Office
County: ONSLOW
Presiding Judge: James C. Dever
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 31 U.S.C. ยง 3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 310 AMENDED JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED in accordance with the courts order entered March 30, 2021, and for the reasons set forth more specifically therein, that defendants', Caddell Construction Company, I nc. and W.G. Yates & Sons Construction Company, motion for summary judgment is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED in accordance with the court's order entered March 30, 2021, with no response having been filed, that defendants Julian Marie Breslow and David J. Valdini & Associates, PA are DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 4/23/2021. (Collins, S.)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 308 JUDGMENT in favor of Caddell Construction Company, Inc., W.G. Yates & Sons Construction Company against Rickey Howard. In accordance with the court's order entered March 30, 2021, and for the reasons set forth more specifically therein, that defendants', Caddell Construction Company, Inc. and W.G. Yates & Sons Construction Company, motion for summary judgment is GRANTED. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 3/30/2021. (Collins, S.)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER granting 215 Motion for Order Directing Personal Service of a Deposition Subpoena. Upon request by the Plaintiff Relator and submission of properly completed subpoena commanding the appearance of Mark Smith for deposition and any required service fees or deposits therefor, the US Marshal shall serve the subpoena pursuant to Rule 45 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Swank on 9/26/2017. (Foell, S.)
September 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting 44 Application to Unseal - The relator's qui tarn complaint, the United States' Notice of Partial Intervention filed July 14, 2014, the United States' Application to Unseal filed August 22, 2014, and this Order beunsealed. The relator shall serve his qui tarn complaint upon the remaining defendants. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 9/17/2014. (Tripp, S.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howard v. Caddell Construction Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rickey Howard
Represented By: Joel Androphy
Represented By: Neal Fowler
Represented By: Sarah Frazier
Represented By: Rachel L. Grier
Represented By: Gary W. Jackson
Represented By: Charles H. Rabon, Jr.
Represented By: Andrew A. Steinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caddell Construction Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W.G. Yates & Sons Construction Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pompano Masonry Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Breslow Construction, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David J. Valdini & Associates, P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seitlin & Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julian Marie Breslow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Jay Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleetus McHenry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Canitano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David J. Valdini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale A. Belis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jillian Breslow Phelps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?