United States of America v. McDaniel Personal Property

Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: McDaniel Personal Property
Case Number: 7:2012cv00314
Filed: October 31, 2012
Court: North Carolina Eastern District Court
Office: Southern Division Office
County: ROBESON
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881 Forfeiture Property-Drugs
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 11, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 11 Motion for Entry of Default and denying as moot 12 Motion for Default Judgment - Signed by Julie A. Richards, Clerk of Court on 09/11/2013. (Baker, C.)
January 30, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 17 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 01/29/2014. (Baker, C.)
January 31, 2014 30 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA against - Signed by Julie A. Richards, Clerk of Court on 01/31/2014. (Baker, C.)
March 26, 2014 33 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED JUDGMENT - Signed by Julie A. Richards, Clerk of Court on 03/26/2014. (Baker, C.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. McDaniel Personal Property
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Stephen A. West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McDaniel Personal Property
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.