Jenkins v. Astrue
Plaintiff: Ethel Marie Jenkins
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 7:2012cv00351
Filed: December 20, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Southern Division Office
County: COLUMBUS
Presiding Judge: Terrence W. Boyle
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER GRANTING 35 Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees. Plaintiff's counsel shall receive a fee of $11,373.71 from retroactive benefits for representation in Federal District Court, and the remaining balance shall be released to the plaintiff. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 10/6/2014. (Fisher, M.)
June 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER GRANTING 31 Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees pursuant to the EAJA. Plaintiff's counsel is awarded fees in the amount of $9,125.00. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 6/6/2014. (Fisher, M.)
February 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTING 18 Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, and DENYING 22 Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. The judgment of the Commissioner is REVERSED, and this case is REMANDED for an award of benefits. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 2/11/2014. (Fisher, M.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jenkins v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Represented By: Jeannette M. Mandycz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ethel Marie Jenkins
Represented By: James B. Gillespie, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?