Gentile, et al v. Brunswick County Sheriff's Department, et al

Plaintiff: Andrew Gentile, Christine Gentile and Redgator Pawn Shop
Defendant: Brunswick County Sheriff's Department, John Ingram, Ryan Newman, Michael Murray, Brunswick County, Western Surety Company and Meredith Everhart
Case Number: 7:2013cv00081
Filed: April 25, 2013
Court: North Carolina Eastern District Court
Office: Southern Division Office
County: BRUNSWICK
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 17, 2016 127 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 109 Motion for Sanctions and adopting 119 Memorandum and Recommendation as modified - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 6/17/2016. (Baker, C.)
October 1, 2015 99 Opinion or Order of the Court JOINT PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR THE PERSONNEL RECORDS OF PLAINTIFF ANDREW GENTILE, DEFENDANT RYAN NEWMAN, DEFENDANT MICHAEL MURRAY, AND OTHER PERSONNEL INFORMATION RELATING TO OTHER DEPUTIES AND OFFICERS OF THE SHERIFF OF BRUNSWICK COUNTY - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 10/1/2015. (Baker, C.)
April 2, 2014 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 37 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting 15 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; granting 20 Motion to Dismiss; and adopting 58 Memorandum and Recommendation - The parties remaining in this case, plaintiffs and defendants Ingram, Murray, Newman, and Western Surety, are DIRECTED to confer and provide a discovery plan for remaining case activities, in accordance with the courts April 30, 2013 initial order on planning and scheduling, within twenty-one (21) days of this order. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 04/01/2014. (Baker, C.)
December 23, 2013 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 43 Motion to Strike - The court in its discretion will deny the motion to strike and, alternatively, will allow Plaintiffs to file a surreply by no later than December 30, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 12/23/2013. (Baker, C.)
April 30, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING - The court denies without prejudice the motion to dispense with mediation (DE 17) as untimely. The court sets a deadline of May 31, 2013, for the making of any motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdicti on, insufficiency of process, and/or failure to state a claim. Discovery plan due by June 4, 2013. This case is set for scheduling conference by telephone on June 13, 2013 at 1:30 p.m. Counsel should review the attached order in its entirety for additional critical deadlines and information. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 04/30/2013. (Baker, C.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gentile, et al v. Brunswick County Sheriff's Department, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Gentile
Represented By: James E. Hairston, Jr.
Represented By: M. Brad Hill
Represented By: Richard Jennings Hollar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Gentile
Represented By: James E. Hairston, Jr.
Represented By: M. Brad Hill
Represented By: Richard Jennings Hollar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Redgator Pawn Shop
Represented By: James E. Hairston, Jr.
Represented By: M. Brad Hill
Represented By: Richard Jennings Hollar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brunswick County Sheriff's Department
Represented By: Christopher J. Geis
Represented By: Travis Lee Wherry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Ingram
Represented By: Christopher J. Geis
Represented By: Travis Lee Wherry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Newman
Represented By: Christopher J. Geis
Represented By: Travis Lee Wherry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Murray
Represented By: Christopher J. Geis
Represented By: Travis Lee Wherry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brunswick County
Represented By: Christopher J. Geis
Represented By: Travis Lee Wherry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Surety Company
Represented By: Christopher J. Geis
Represented By: Travis Lee Wherry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meredith Everhart
Represented By: David J. Adinolfi, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?