Gillis et al v. Murphy-Brown, LLC
Plaintiff: Annjeanette Gillis, Daqwan Robinson, Woody Gillis, Gwendolyn Pickett, Allen T Johnson, Allen A Johnson, William Murphy, Edna Murphy, Roberto Murphy, Mary Tatum, Lottie Fowler, Darlene Fowler Maynor, Kim Newton, Connie Newton and Kiron Newton
Defendant: Murphy-Brown, LLC
Case Number: 7:2014cv00185
Filed: August 21, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Southern Division Office
County: SAMPSON
Presiding Judge: W. Earl Britt
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 326 ORDER denying 259 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; denying RENEWED ORAL Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law. Signed by Judge David A. Faber on 9/27/2019. (Herrmann, L.)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 325 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 125 Motion in Limine as it relates to the topics stipulated by the parties. All topics that were not agreed upon by the parties were ruled on by the court as the issues arose at trial. Signed by Judge David A. Faber on 3/6/2019. (Herrmann, L.)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 324 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 301 Motion to Allow Post-Trial Contact with Jurors. Signed by Senior Judge David A. Faber on 2/5/2019. (Edwards, S.)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 303 ORDER granting 302 Motion for Pre-Judgment and Post-Judgment Interest. Signed by Senior Judge David A. Faber on 12/28/2018. (Edwards, S.)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 280 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying as moot 78 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 103 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 177 Motion in Limine; denying 222 Motion to Strike; denying as moot 243 Motion for Reconsideration; denying 268 Motion Requesting Use of Special Verdict Form and Interrogatories; denying 270 MOTION to Strike Dr. Rogers' Improper Testimony and for a Curative Instruction; granting 271 Motion to Seal; denying as moot 272 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Senior Judge David A. Faber on 12/6/2018. (Herrmann, L.)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 252 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 221 Motion to Exclude Evidence Regarding Remedial Measures Implicated by Defendant's October 25, 2018 Press Release, to Strike Fourth Amended Sholar Fact Sheet, and for Sanctions. Signed by Senior Judge David A. Faber on 11/28/2018. (Edwards, S.)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 242 Motion to Clarify Objections to Deposition Designations of Kraig Westerbeek and Exclude His Videotaped Testimony. Signed by Senior Judge David A. Faber on 11/19/2018. (Herrmann, L.)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 230 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 99 Motion in Limine; denying 107 Motion for Reconsideration ; granting 108 Motion in Limine to the extent that plaintiffs should not offer any financial evidence unless defendant opens the door to its introduction. Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety. Signed by Senior Judge David A. Faber on 11/13/2018. (Edwards, S.)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 225 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 105 Motion in Limine; denying as moot 179 Motion in Limine; granting 187 Motion in Limine; denying 189 Motion to Enforce Scheduling Order and Strike Untimely Motions in Limine; granting 190 Motio n in Limine; denying 194 Motion for a Jury Drawn from the Southern Division Jury Pool; denying 196 Motion to Exclude Questions and Argument That Defendant Should Have Settled. Signed by Senior Judge David A. Faber on 11/9/2018. (Herrmann, L.)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER granting 174 Motion for Order Governing Exhibits. Signed by Judge David A. Faber on 11/8/2018. (Herrmann, L.)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 217 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 93 Motion in Limine. Signed by Senior Judge David A. Faber on 11/7/2018. (Edwards, S.)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 216 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 118 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge David A. Faber on 11/6/2018. (Herrmann, L.)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 207 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 112 Motion in Limine. Signed by Senior Judge David A. Faber on 11/5/2018. (Edwards, S.)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER granting 110 Motion to Bifurcate. Signed by Judge David A. Faber on 10/24/2018. (Herrmann, L.)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 173 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 122 Motion in Limine with the caveat that defendants counsel may request a bench conference at trial consistent with the courts prior ruling. Signed by Senior Judge David A. Faber on 10/23/2018. (Edwards, S.)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 72 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 74 Motion in Limine; granting 76 Motion in Limine; denying 80 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 82 Motion in Limi ne. As to the other defense experts (William Kreutzberger, Roger Waldon, Richard Houseman, Nicholas Piggott, Keith Ramsey, Herman Gibb), the courts ruling is HELD IN ABEYANCE. Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety. Signed by Senior Judge W. Earl Britt on 7/20/2018. (Edwards, S.)
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting 55 Motion to Substitute Party. Signed by United States Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr., on 8/14/2017. (Edwards, S.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gillis et al v. Murphy-Brown, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Murphy-Brown, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annjeanette Gillis
Represented By: John S. Hughes
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daqwan Robinson
Represented By: John S. Hughes
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Woody Gillis
Represented By: John S. Hughes
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gwendolyn Pickett
Represented By: John S. Hughes
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen T Johnson
Represented By: John S. Hughes
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen A Johnson
Represented By: John S. Hughes
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Murphy
Represented By: John S. Hughes
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edna Murphy
Represented By: John S. Hughes
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberto Murphy
Represented By: John S. Hughes
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Tatum
Represented By: John S. Hughes
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lottie Fowler
Represented By: John S. Hughes
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darlene Fowler Maynor
Represented By: John S. Hughes
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Newton
Represented By: John S. Hughes
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connie Newton
Represented By: John S. Hughes
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kiron Newton
Represented By: John S. Hughes
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?