Edwards, et al. v. Genex Cooperative, Inc.
Plaintiff: Dexter Edwards and Nicholas Edwards
Defendant: Genex Cooperative, Inc.
Case Number: 7:2016cv00053
Filed: March 24, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Southern Division Office
County: xxU.S. Outside District
Presiding Judge: Terrence W. Boyle
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting 45 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 48 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; and denying 54 Motion to Strike. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 2/8/2018. (Stouch, L.)
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting 29 Motion to Compel and granting 32 Motion to Modify Scheduling Order. Signed by US Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on 3/13/2017. (Stouch, L.)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER denying 15 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 7/29/2016. (Romine, L.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edwards, et al. v. Genex Cooperative, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dexter Edwards
Represented By: E. C. Thompson, III
Represented By: Kennedy Lee Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Edwards
Represented By: E. C. Thompson, III
Represented By: Kennedy Lee Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genex Cooperative, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?