Thrasher v. Colvin
Plaintiff: Angela Thrasher
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Case Number: 7:2016cv00311
Filed: September 6, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Southern Division Office
County: PENDER
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 416
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting 37 Motion for Attorney Fees Pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 406(b). Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 8/14/2019. (Collins, S.)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER - It is ORDERED that Defendant pay to Plaintiff $6,000.00 in attorneys fees in full satisfaction of any and all claims arising under the Equal Access to Justice Act, 28 U.S.C. § 2412. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 10/17/2017. (Collins, S.)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 JUDGMENT - Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 9/21/2017. (Collins, S.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thrasher v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Thrasher
Represented By: Jonathan P. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?