Cates v. Colvin
Plaintiff: Taylor D. Cates
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Case Number: 7:2016cv00324
Filed: September 14, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Southern Division Office
County: NEWHANOVER
Presiding Judge: James C. Dever
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 416
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees. IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that Plaintiff's counsel be awarded fees under 42 U.S.C. § 406(b) in the amount of $13,141.00, and refund to Plaintiff the smaller award between this amount and the EAJA award. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 3/27/2019. (Sellers, N.)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting 25 Motion for Bill of Costs. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 10/23/2017. (Briggeman, N.)
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the Court hereby reverses the Commissioner's decision under sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g) and § 1383(c)(3) and remands the case to the Commissioner for further proceedings. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 10/6/2017. (Briggeman, N.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cates v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taylor D. Cates
Represented By: Jonathan P. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?