McGirt v. Colvin
Plaintiff: Christy Caviggia McGirt
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Case Number: 7:2016cv00389
Filed: December 5, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Southern Division Office
County: PENDER
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting 28 Motion for Attorney Fees under Section 406(b). It is ORDERED that Plaintiff's counsel be awarded fees under 42 U.S.C. § 406(b) in the amount of $7,513.00, and refund to Plaintiff the smaller award between this amount and the EAJA award. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 6/21/2019. (Collins, S.)
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting 26 Consent Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 7/28/2017. (Collins, S.)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 CLERK'S JUDGMENT - Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 6/13/2017. (Tripp, S.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McGirt v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christy Caviggia McGirt
Represented By: Michael Gray Gillespie
Represented By: Charlotte Williams Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?