McAllister v. Malfitano et al
Plaintiff: John D. McAllister
Defendant: Timothy Malfitano and Detective Selogy
Case Number: 7:2017cv00066
Filed: April 3, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Southern Division Office
County: WAKE
Presiding Judge: James C. Dever
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 74 JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the court GRANTS defendants' motions to dismiss and for summary judgment [D.E. 62, 65], and DENIES plaintiff's motion [D.E. 60]. Defendants may file motions for costs in accordance with t he Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and this court's local rules. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the court GRANTS Interlocal's motion to dismiss [D.E. 43] on 4/30/2018 and Interlocal Risk Financing Fund of North Carolina was dismissed from the case. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 2/8/2019. (Sellers, N.)
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting 43 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting in part 51 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 4/30/2018. Sent to John D. McAllister at 2305 Columbus St. Apt. D Greensboro, NC 27406 via US Mail. (Briggeman, N.)
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER denying 11 Motion for Default Judgment; staying 17 Motion to Produce. Plaintiff has until August 28, 2017 to file proof of service concerning Selogy. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 8/14/2017. (Briggeman, N.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McAllister v. Malfitano et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John D. McAllister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Malfitano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detective Selogy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?