Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC v. 18.469 Acres, +/-, in Sampson County, NC, on PIN 14028674001, and Described As 63.666 Acres in B. 279, P. 306, 69.50 Acres in B. 279, P. 308, 70.50 Acres in B. 279, P. 310 et al
Plaintiff: Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC
Defendant: Warren A. ReBarker, Alan Lewis ReBarker and 18.469 Acres, +/-, in Sampson County, NC, on PIN 14028674001, and Described As 63.666 Acres in B. 279, P. 306, 69.50 Acres in B. 279, P. 308, 70.50 Acres in B. 279, P. 310
Case Number: 7:2018cv00131
Filed: July 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Southern Division Office
County: SAMPSON
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 15:717
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2018 Filing 7 DEFENDANTS' ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by 18.469 Acres, /-, in Sampson County, NC, on PIN 14028674001, and Described As 63.666 Acres in B. 279, P. 306, 69.50 Acres in B. 279, P. 308, 70.50 Acres in B. 279, P. 310, Alan Lewis ReBarker, Warren A. ReBarker. (Lollar, Charles)
September 10, 2018 Filing 6 Notice filed by Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC regarding proof of service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Acceptance of Service for Alan Lewis ReBarker, Warren A. ReBarker, and the real property owned thereby described in the Complaint) (Kitchin, Henry)
August 1, 2018 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Jose A. Coker on behalf of Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC. (Coker, Jose)
August 1, 2018 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by R. Jonathan Charleston on behalf of Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC. (Charleston, R.)
July 23, 2018 Notice to Counsel - All Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
July 20, 2018 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Henry L. Kitchin, Jr on behalf of Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC. (Kitchin, Henry)
July 20, 2018 Filing 2 Financial Disclosure Statement by Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Dominion Energy, Inc., Corporate Parent Duke Energy Corp., Corporate Parent Southern Company for Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC. (Kitchin, Henry)
July 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-4588904.), filed by Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits to Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1A Depiction of 4001 Parcel, #3 Exhibit 1B Depiction of 6001 Parcel, #4 Exhibit 2 FERC Certificate, #5 Exhibit 3 Map Depicting Route of ACP Project, #6 Exhibit 4A Plat of 4001 Parcel Easements, #7 Exhibit 4B Plat of 6001 Parcel Easements, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Notice of Filing of Complaint in Condemnation, #10 Notice Regarding Use of Notice of Filing In Lieu of Summonses) (Kitchin, Henry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC v. 18.469 Acres, +/-, in Sampson County, NC, on PIN 14028674001, and Described As 63.666 Acres in B. 279, P. 306, 69.50 Acres in B. 279, P. 308, 70.50 Acres in B. 279, P. 310 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC
Represented By: Henry L. Kitchin, Jr.
Represented By: R. Jonathan Charleston
Represented By: Jose A. Coker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren A. ReBarker
Represented By: Charles M. Lollar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Lewis ReBarker
Represented By: Charles M. Lollar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 18.469 Acres, +/-, in Sampson County, NC, on PIN 14028674001, and Described As 63.666 Acres in B. 279, P. 306, 69.50 Acres in B. 279, P. 308, 70.50 Acres in B. 279, P. 310
Represented By: Charles M. Lollar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?