Gonzalez v. Cissna et al
Plaintiff: Ansberto Fernandez Gonzalez
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services and Director L Frank Cissna
Case Number: 7:2018cv00135
Filed: July 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Southern Division Office
County: BEAUFORT
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2018 TEXT ORDER granting Defendants' unopposed Motion for Extension of Time #8 . For good cause shown, it is ordered that Defendants shall have up to and including October 2, 2018, within which to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's cause of action under the Freedom of Information Act. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 8/31/2018. (Hockaday, A.)
August 31, 2018 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #8 MOTION for Extension of Time. (Sellers, N.)
August 30, 2018 Filing 9 DISREGARD. Inadvertently entered in the wrong case. MOTION for Extension of Time filed by L Frank Cissna, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Warlick, Lori) Modified on 8/31/2018 (Sellers, N.).
August 30, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time filed by L Frank Cissna, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Warlick, Lori)
August 29, 2018 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by Lori B. Warlick on behalf of L Frank Cissna, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Warlick, Lori)
August 10, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Returned Executed by US Attorney's Office for the Eastern District of North Carolina filed by Ansberto Fernandez Gonzalez as to L Frank Cissna served on 8/3/2018, answer due 10/2/2018; United States Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 8/3/2018, answer due 10/2/2018. (Hinnant, Christopher)
August 1, 2018 Filing 5 Summonses Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel is directed to print summonses and effect service. (Stouch, L.)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Redesignating Division to Southern Division. This case is redesignated as a Southern Division case. The Honorable Terrence W. Boyle, United States District Judge, will remain the presiding judge. All future documents shall reflect the new case number of 7:18-CV-135-BO. No further filing shall be made in 2:18-CV-34-BO. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 7/30/2018. (Stouch, L.)
July 30, 2018 Notice to Counsel - This case should have been filed in the Southern division. The Clerk will enter a reassignment order correcting the error. (Rudd, D.)
July 30, 2018 Notice to Counsel - Counsel is reminded that the court prefers flattened pdf fillable forms. Counsel should "flatten" the civil coversheet and proposed summons prior to attaching it in accordance with Section IV.B of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. No action required at this time. (Rudd, D.)
July 30, 2018 Notice to Counsel - Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 10.1(c), except for the initial filing, all pleadings, motions, discovery, notices, memoranda and other papers filed with the clerk of court shall bear the case number assigned by the clerk. No action required at this time. (Rudd, D.)
July 27, 2018 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Christopher M. Hinnant on behalf of Ansberto Fernandez Gonzalez. (Hinnant, Christopher)
July 27, 2018 Filing 2 Financial Disclosure Statement by Ansberto Fernandez Gonzalez (Hinnant, Christopher)
July 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against L Frank Cissna, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-4597079.), filed by Ansberto Fernandez Gonzalez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons USAO Summons, #3 Proposed Summons USAG Summons, #4 Proposed Summons USCIS Summons) (Hinnant, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzalez v. Cissna et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Lori B. Warlick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director L Frank Cissna
Represented By: Lori B. Warlick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ansberto Fernandez Gonzalez
Represented By: Christopher M. Hinnant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?