Hayes v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: DeeDee Kay Hayes
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 7:2018cv00145
Filed: August 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Southern Division Office
County: BRUNSWICK
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Social Security: HIA
Cause of Action: 42:206
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2018 Filing 9 USM-285 Form - Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Jeff Sessions, United States Attorney General on 8/27/2018. (Sellers, N.)
August 29, 2018 Filing 8 Summons Returned Executed by Personal Service as to Nancy A. Berryhill served on 8/28/2018, answer due 10/27/2018. (Sellers, N.)
August 28, 2018 Filing 7 USM-285 Form - Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Nancy A. Berryhill, Acting Commissioner of Social Security on 8/24/2018. (Sellers, N.)
August 21, 2018 Remark - Certified copy of #4 ORDER and file-stamped copies of complaint, summonses, and notice of appearance forwarded to the US Marshals for service, along with USM-285 forms. (Herrmann, L.)
August 21, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 US Marshals 285 Forms) (Herrmann, L.)
August 21, 2018 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill, filed by DeeDee Kay Hayes. (Herrmann, L.)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The clerk is directed to file the complaint and issue the summons prepared by plaintiff. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve the summons and a copy of the complaint on defendant. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever, III on 8/21/2018. (Herrmann, L.)
August 20, 2018 Motion Submitted to Chief Judge James C. Dever III regarding #3 Amended MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Sellers, N.)
August 20, 2018 Filing 3 Amended MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis , filed by DeeDee Kay Hayes. (Savidge, Monica)
August 13, 2018 Motion Submitted to Chief Judge James C. Dever III regarding #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Sellers, N.)
August 13, 2018 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to DeeDee Kay Hayes. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.)
August 9, 2018 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Monica Rathke Savidge on behalf of DeeDee Kay Hayes. (Savidge, Monica)
August 9, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis , filed by DeeDee Kay Hayes. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons) (Savidge, Monica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hayes v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DeeDee Kay Hayes
Represented By: Monica Rathke Savidge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?