Lexington Marine Group, LLC v. Crossville BNRV Sales, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Lexington Marine Group, LLC
Defendant: Recreation Unlimited, LLC, Crossville BNRV Sales, LLC, Ridgeland Recreational Vehicles, Inc. and Derwood L. Littlefield
Case Number: 7:2018cv00152
Filed: August 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Southern Division Office
County: BRUNSWICK
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2018 REMINDER TO COUNSEL. Pursuant to Judge Boyle's #Practice Preferences located on the court's website, counsel shall provide a courtesy copy of all documents over 20 pages, by mailing or delivering to the clerk's office in Raleigh. (Stouch, L.)
October 5, 2018 Filing 30 Declaration regarding #28 Response in Opposition to Motion of Hudson Wang by Lexington Marine Group, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A: Bills of Lading) (Boardman, Karen)
October 5, 2018 Filing 29 MOTION Request for Judicial Notice regarding #28 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Lexington Marine Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1: Answer to the Counterclaims filed by The International Pontoon Corporation and Derwood L. Littlefield, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2: Notice of Electronic Filing for the Order on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3: Limited liability company registration records for Crossville BNRV Sales, LLC from the Tennessee Secretary of State, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4: Corporate registration records for Ridgeland Recreational Vehicles, Inc. from the South Carolina Secretary of State, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5: Application for Certificate of Authority for Ridgeland Recreational Vehicles, Inc., as filed with the North Carolina Secretary of State, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6: Certificate of Organization for Recreation Unlimited, LLC, issued by the Georgia Secretary of State, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7: Limited liability company registration records for Recreation Unlimited, LLC, from the Tennessee Secretary of State, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8: Certificate of Administrative Dissolution/Revocation for The International Pontoon Corporation issued by the Georgia Secretary of State, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9: Administrative Office of U.S. Courts, Table C-5 U.S. District CourtsCivil Statistical Tables for the Federal Judiciary) (Boardman, Karen)
October 5, 2018 Filing 28 RESPONSE in Opposition regarding #10 MOTION to Dismiss ,Transfer, or Stay filed by Lexington Marine Group, LLC. (Boardman, Karen)
September 21, 2018 Filing 27 Notice of Appearance filed by Joseph H. Nanney, Jr on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Nanney, Joseph)
September 19, 2018 Filing 26 Notice of Appearance filed by Robert William Weston on behalf of Lexington Marine Group, LLC. (Weston, Robert)
September 18, 2018 TEXT ORDER AMENDING September 17, 2018 Text Order to reflect that Plaintiff shall have up to and including October 5, 2018, within which to respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, Transfer or Stay #10 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 9/18/2018. (Hockaday, A.)
September 17, 2018 Filing 25 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #10 MOTION to Dismiss ,Transfer, or Stay filed by Lexington Marine Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Boardman, Karen)
September 17, 2018 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #25 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #10 MOTION to Dismiss ,Transfer, or Stay. (Stouch, L.)
September 17, 2018 TEXT ORDER granting Plaintiff's Consent Motion for Extension of Time #25 . For good cause shown, it is ordered that Plaintiff shall have up to and including October 4, 2018, within which to respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, Transfer or Stay #10 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 9/17/2018. (Hockaday, A.)
September 7, 2018 Filing 24 Memorandum in Support regarding #23 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, #22 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, #21 Consent MOTION to Seal Document #14 PROPOSED SEALED Declaration, #15 Notice - other, filed by Lexington Marine Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit C: Valencell, Inc. v. Apple, Inc., #2 Exhibit Exhibit D: Thompson Auto. Labs, Inc. v. Ill. Tool Works Inc., #3 Exhibit Exhibit E: Crain v. DeBartolo) (Boardman, Karen)
September 7, 2018 Filing 23 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit (Selected Participants Only)by Plaintiff Lexington Marine Group, LLC (available to: Defendants Crossville BNRV Sales, LLC, Derwood L. Littlefield, Recreation Unlimited, LLC, Ridgeland Recreational Vehicles, Inc., Plaintiff Lexington Marine Group, LLC) regarding #21 Consent MOTION to Seal Document #14 PROPOSED SEALED Declaration, #15 Notice - other, . (Boardman, Karen)
September 7, 2018 Filing 22 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit (Selected Participants Only)by Plaintiff Lexington Marine Group, LLC (available to: Defendants Crossville BNRV Sales, LLC, Derwood L. Littlefield, Recreation Unlimited, LLC, Ridgeland Recreational Vehicles, Inc., Plaintiff Lexington Marine Group, LLC) regarding #21 Consent MOTION to Seal Document #14 PROPOSED SEALED Declaration, #15 Notice - other, . (Boardman, Karen)
September 7, 2018 Filing 21 Consent MOTION to Seal Document #14 PROPOSED SEALED Declaration, #15 Notice - other, filed by Lexington Marine Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Boardman, Karen)
September 4, 2018 Filing 20 WITHDRAWAL of Motion by Lexington Marine Group, LLC. Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Boardman, Karen)
September 4, 2018 Filing 19 Financial Disclosure Statement by Lexington Marine Group, LLC (Boardman, Karen)
September 4, 2018 Filing 18 Notice of Appearance filed by Karen Schuller Boardman on behalf of Lexington Marine Group, LLC. (Boardman, Karen)
September 4, 2018 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lexington Marine Group, LLC. Derwood L. Littlefield served on 8/10/2018, answer due 8/31/2018; Recreation Unlimited, LLC served on 8/10/2018, answer due 8/31/2018. (Boardman, Karen)
September 4, 2018 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lexington Marine Group, LLC. Crossville BNRV Sales, LLC served on 8/10/2018, answer due 8/31/2018; Ridgeland Recreational Vehicles, Inc. served on 8/10/2018, answer due 8/31/2018. (Boardman, Karen)
August 31, 2018 Filing 15 Notice filed by Crossville BNRV Sales, LLC, Derwood L. Littlefield, Recreation Unlimited, LLC, Ridgeland Recreational Vehicles, Inc. regarding #14 PROPOSED SEALED Declaration, Notice to Lexington Marine Group, LLC of Provisional Filing Under Seal. (Bennett, Raymond)
August 31, 2018 Filing 14 PROPOSED SEALED Declaration (Selected Participants Only)by Raymond M. Bennett (available to: Defendants Crossville BNRV Sales, LLC, Derwood L. Littlefield, Recreation Unlimited, LLC, Ridgeland Recreational Vehicles, Inc., Plaintiff Lexington Marine Group, LLC) regarding #10 MOTION to Dismiss ,Transfer, or Stay. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Memorandum of Understanding, #2 Exhibit B - Asset Purchase Agreement) (Bennett, Raymond)
August 31, 2018 Filing 13 Declaration regarding #10 MOTION to Dismiss ,Transfer, or Stay of Derwood L. Littlefield by Recreation Unlimited, LLC, Ridgeland Recreational Vehicles, Inc., Crossville BNRV Sales, LLC, Derwood L. Littlefield filed by Recreation Unlimited, LLC, Ridgeland Recreational Vehicles, Inc., Crossville BNRV Sales, LLC, Derwood L. Littlefield. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email to Ms. Kincaid) (Bennett, Raymond)
August 31, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION regarding #10 MOTION to Dismiss ,Transfer, or Stay (Request for Judicial Notice) filed by Crossville BNRV Sales, LLC, Derwood L. Littlefield, Recreation Unlimited, LLC, Ridgeland Recreational Vehicles, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint for Damages and Injunctive Relief, Dkt. No. 1, #2 Exhibit 2 - Order Signed by the Honorable William S. Duffey, Dkt. No. 5, #3 Exhibit 3 - Plaintiffs Motion to Reopen Lawsuit, Dkt. No. 6, #4 Exhibit 4 - Order Signed by the Honorable William S. Duffey on May 23, 2018, Dkt. No. 9, #5 Exhibit 5 - Answer and Counterclaims, Dkt. No. 10, #6 Exhibit 6 - Defendants Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction, Dkt. No. 12, #7 Exhibit 7 - Order Signed by the Honorable Steve C. Jones on August 10, 2018, Denying Defendants Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction, Dkt. No. 22, #8 Exhibit 8 - Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan, Dkt. No. 17, #9 Exhibit 9 - Scheduling Order, Dkt. No. 20) (Bennett, Raymond)
August 31, 2018 Filing 11 Memorandum in Support regarding #10 MOTION to Dismiss ,Transfer, or Stay filed by Crossville BNRV Sales, LLC, Derwood L. Littlefield, Recreation Unlimited, LLC, Ridgeland Recreational Vehicles, Inc.. (Bennett, Raymond)
August 31, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss ,Transfer, or Stay filed by Crossville BNRV Sales, LLC, Derwood L. Littlefield, Recreation Unlimited, LLC, Ridgeland Recreational Vehicles, Inc.. (Bennett, Raymond)
August 27, 2018 Filing 9 Notice filed by Crossville BNRV Sales, LLC, Derwood L. Littlefield, Recreation Unlimited, LLC, Ridgeland Recreational Vehicles, Inc. Notice of Filing Notice of Removal with Brunswick County Superior Court (Local Rule 5.3(a)(2)). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal) (Bennett, Raymond)
August 24, 2018 Filing 8 Financial Disclosure Statement by Derwood L. Littlefield (Bennett, Raymond)
August 24, 2018 Filing 7 Financial Disclosure Statement by Recreation Unlimited, LLC (Bennett, Raymond)
August 24, 2018 Filing 6 Financial Disclosure Statement by Ridgeland Recreational Vehicles, Inc. (Bennett, Raymond)
August 24, 2018 Filing 5 Financial Disclosure Statement by Crossville BNRV Sales, LLC (Bennett, Raymond)
August 24, 2018 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Jonathon D. Townsend on behalf of All Defendants. (Townsend, Jonathon)
August 24, 2018 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Raymond M. Bennett on behalf of All Defendants. (Bennett, Raymond)
August 21, 2018 Filing 2 Notice of Removal to Plaintiff's Counsel. Copy sent to Mitzi Y. Kincaid at Kincaid & Associates, PLLC via US Mail to 5215 Junction Circle, Suite 100, Wilmington, NC, Suite 100. (Stouch, L.)
August 21, 2018 Notice to Counsel - All counsel should file a notice of appearance pursuant to Local Rule 5.2. (Stouch, L.)
August 21, 2018 NOTICE TO COUNSEL - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Crossville BNRV Sales, LLC, Derwood L. Littlefield, Recreation Unlimited, LLC, Ridgeland Recreational Vehicles, Inc.. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Stouch, L.)
August 20, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Recreation Unlimited, LLC, Ridgeland Recreational Vehicles, Inc., Crossville BNRV Sales, LLC, Derwood L. Littlefield from Brunswick County, case number 18cvs1508. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-4625614), filed by Recreation Unlimited, LLC, Ridgeland Recreational Vehicles, Inc., Crossville BNRV Sales, LLC, Derwood L. Littlefield. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Removal Supplemental Coversheet, #3 Exhibit A - Verified Complaint, #4 Exhibit B - Civil Summons, #5 Exhibit C - Civil Summons, #6 Exhibit D - Civil Summons, #7 Exhibit E - Civil Summons) (Bennett, Raymond)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lexington Marine Group, LLC v. Crossville BNRV Sales, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Recreation Unlimited, LLC
Represented By: Raymond M. Bennett
Represented By: Jonathon D. Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crossville BNRV Sales, LLC
Represented By: Raymond M. Bennett
Represented By: Jonathon D. Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ridgeland Recreational Vehicles, Inc.
Represented By: Raymond M. Bennett
Represented By: Jonathon D. Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derwood L. Littlefield
Represented By: Raymond M. Bennett
Represented By: Jonathon D. Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lexington Marine Group, LLC
Represented By: Karen Schuller Boardman
Represented By: Joseph H. Nanney, Jr.
Represented By: Robert William Weston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?