McEwen v. Rogers and Breece, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Michael C. McEwen
Defendant: Corey R. Breece, Rogers and Breece, Inc., Robert W. Breece and Sharman B. Craven
Case Number: 7:2018cv00157
Filed: August 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER FOR DISCOVERY PLAN sent to all parties. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 10/19/2018. (Sellers, N.)
October 18, 2018 Filing 13 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint by Corey R. Breece, Robert W. Breece, Sharman B. Craven, Rogers and Breece, Inc.. (McKnight, Michael)
September 11, 2018 TEXT ORDER granting Defendants' unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint #12 . For good cause shown, it is ordered that Defendants shall have up to and including October 18, 2018, within which to answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint #7 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 9/11/2018. (Hockaday, A.)
September 11, 2018 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #7 Amended Complaint. (Sellers, N.)
September 11, 2018 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #7 Amended Complaint filed by Corey R. Breece, Robert W. Breece, Sharman B. Craven, Rogers and Breece, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order re Consent Motion for Extension of Time) (McKnight, Michael)
September 11, 2018 Filing 11 Financial Disclosure Statement by Rogers and Breece, Inc. (McKnight, Michael)
September 11, 2018 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance filed by Michael Douglas McKnight on behalf of All Defendants. (McKnight, Michael)
September 11, 2018 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance filed by Kevin Scott Joyner on behalf of All Defendants. (Joyner, Kevin)
September 10, 2018 Filing 8 Affidavit of Service for Summons and Amended Complaint filed by Michael C. McEwen served on Rogers and Breece, Inc. on 08-30-2018. (Gessner, L.)
August 27, 2018 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Corey R. Breece, Robert W. Breece, Sharman B. Craven, Rogers and Breece, Inc., filed by Michael C. McEwen. (Gessner, L.)
August 27, 2018 Filing 6 Financial Disclosure Statement by Michael C. McEwen (Gessner, L.)
August 27, 2018 Filing 5 Notice filed by Michael C. McEwen Civil Cover Sheet. (Gessner, L.)
August 27, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Corey R. Breece, Robert W. Breece, Sharman B. Craven, Rogers and Breece, Inc. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*). (Rudd, D.)
August 27, 2018 Notice to Counsel - Counsel is reminded that the court prefers flattened pdf fillable forms. Counsel should "flatten" the proposed summons prior to attaching it in accordance with Section IV.B of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. No further action needed at this time. (Rudd, D.)
August 27, 2018 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by L. Michelle Gessner on behalf of Michael C. McEwen. (Gessner, L.)
August 27, 2018 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Michael C. McEwen. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.)
August 27, 2018 Notice to Counsel - Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
August 27, 2018 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Complaint - Counsel failed to file a JS44 Civil Cover Sheet as required by the Court. Counsel should file a Cover Sheet using the event "Notice-Other" as soon as possible. (Rudd, D.)
August 27, 2018 Filing 2 Notice filed by Michael C. McEwen regarding #1 Complaint . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons) (Gessner, L.) (Attachment 1, 2 and 3 flattened and replaced on 8/28/2018) (Edwards, S.).
August 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-4633903.), filed by Michael C. McEwen. (Gessner, L.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McEwen v. Rogers and Breece, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael C. McEwen
Represented By: L. Michelle Gessner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corey R. Breece
Represented By: Michael Douglas McKnight
Represented By: Kevin Scott Joyner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rogers and Breece, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Douglas McKnight
Represented By: Kevin Scott Joyner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert W. Breece
Represented By: Michael Douglas McKnight
Represented By: Kevin Scott Joyner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharman B. Craven
Represented By: Michael Douglas McKnight
Represented By: Kevin Scott Joyner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?