Scott Farms, Inc. v. Wayne Bailey, Inc.
Interested Party: Clerk of Court Stephanie Butler and Marjorie K. Lynch
Appellant: Scott Farms, Inc.
Appellee: Wayne Bailey, Inc.
Case Number: 7:2018cv00186
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2018 Filing 14 Notice to Parties Regarding Filing of Bankruptcy Record on Appeal. (Sellers, N.)
November 14, 2018 Filing 13 Certificate of Readiness and Completion of Record filed by the Bankruptcy Court. (McNeill, A)
November 14, 2018 Filing 12 SEALED BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on July 24, 2018, before Judge Stephani W. Humrickhouse. Court Reporter/Transcriber J&J Court Transcribers, Inc.. This document must be accessed through the originating Bankruptcy Court.. (McNeill, A)
November 14, 2018 Filing 11 Appellee's Bankruptcy Record on Appeal filed. Transmitting copy of docket sheet. The Bankruptcy Court certifies that this is a true and accurate copy of the docket on file.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Number 1 admitted at 7/24/2018 hearing, #2 Exhibit No. 2 admitted at 7/24/2018 hearing, #3 Docket in Case Number: 18-00284-5-SWH) (McNeill, A)
November 14, 2018 Filing 10 Part II of Appellant's of Bankruptcy Record on Appeal filed. Transmitting copy of docket sheet. The Bankruptcy Court certifies that this is a true and accurate copy of the docket on file.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Number 1 admitted at 7/24/2018 hearing, #2 Exhibit No. 2 admitted at 7/24/2018 hearing, #3 Docket in Case Number: 18-00284-5-SWH) (McNeill, A)
November 14, 2018 Filing 9 Appellant's Bankruptcy Record on Appeal filed. The Bankruptcy Court certifies that these are a true and accurate copies of the docket on file. (Attachments: #1 Voluntary Chapter 11 Petition filed January 21, 2018, #2 Debtor's Declaration, Summary of Schedules, Schedules and Statement of Financial Affairs filed January 30, 2018, #3 Consent Order Establishing Exclusive Procedures for the Assertion, Resolution, and Satisfaction of Claims Arising Under the Perishable Agricultural Commodities Act filed March 5, 2018, #4 PACA Proof of Claim of Scott Farms, Inc. filed April 16, 2018, #5 Ex Parte Motion to Extend Time Within Which To Object To PACA Proofs of Claim filed May 9, 2018, #6 Ex Parte Order Extending Time Within Which To Object To PACA Proofs of Claims filed May 10, 2018, #7 Objection to PACA Claim No. 87 Filed by Scott Farms, Inc. filed June 4, 2018, #8 Response of Scott Farms, Inc. in Opposition to Objection to PACA Claim No. 87 filed June 25, 2018, #9 Amended Objection to PACA Claim No. 87 Filed by Scott Farms, Inc. filed June 25, 2018, #10 Scott Farms Inc.'s Response In Opposition to Amended Objection to Claim No. 87 filed July 23, 2018, #11 Scott Farms, Inc.'s Supplement To Its Response In Opposition to Amended Objection to Claim #87 filed July 26, 2018, #12 Debtor's Reply To Scott Farms Inc.'s Supplement To Its Response In Opposition To Amended Objection to Claim #87 filed August 8, 2018, #13 Scott Farms Inc.'s Sur-Reply to Debtor's Reply filed August 10, 2018, #14 Order Allowing Objection to PACA Claim of Scott Farms, Inc. filed September 28, 2018, #15 Order Confirming First Amended Plan Of Reorganization filed October 2, 2018, #16 Scott Farms, Inc.'s Notice of Appeal filed October 11, 2018) (McNeill, A)
October 16, 2018 Filing 8 Financial Disclosure Statement by Wayne Bailey, Inc. (Crampton, Gregory)
October 15, 2018 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by Steven Craig Newton, II on behalf of Wayne Bailey, Inc.. (Newton, Steven)
October 15, 2018 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Gregory Byrd Crampton on behalf of Wayne Bailey, Inc.. (Crampton, Gregory)
October 12, 2018 Filing 5 Financial Disclosure Statement by Scott Farms, Inc. (Clodfelter, Catherine)
October 12, 2018 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Catherine G. Clodfelter on behalf of Scott Farms, Inc.. (Clodfelter, Catherine)
October 12, 2018 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Brian David Darer on behalf of Scott Farms, Inc.. (Darer, Brian)
October 12, 2018 Notice to Counsel - All Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
October 12, 2018 Filing 2 Notice of Docketing and Briefing Deadline regarding #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. (Rudd, D.)
October 12, 2018 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 18-00284-5-SWH. File received. (Attachments: #1 Order Under Appeal - Order of Judge Humrickhouse filed 09/30/2018) (McNeill, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott Farms, Inc. v. Wayne Bailey, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Clerk of Court Stephanie Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Marjorie K. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Scott Farms, Inc.
Represented By: Brian David Darer
Represented By: Catherine G. Clodfelter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Wayne Bailey, Inc.
Represented By: Trawick H. Stubbs, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph Z. Frost
Represented By: Gregory Byrd Crampton
Represented By: Laurie B. Biggs
Represented By: Steven Craig Newton, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?