Definitive Staffing Solutions, Inc. v. Staffing Advantage, L.L.C. et al

Plaintiff: Definitive Staffing Solutions, Inc.
Defendant: The Coastal Group, Inc., Randal E Gore, Sandra L Gore and Staffing Advantage, L.L.C.
Case Number: 7:2018cv00187
Filed: October 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2018 TEXT ORDER granting the Consent Motion for Extension of Time #13 . For good cause shown, it is ordered that Defendant Staffing Advantage, L.L.C. and The Coastal Group, Inc., shall have up to and including December 18, 2018, within which to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint #1 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 11/6/2018. (Hockaday, A.)
November 6, 2018 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint. (Collins, S.)
November 2, 2018 Filing 13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint,, filed by Staffing Advantage, L.L.C., The Coastal Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Senter, David)
November 2, 2018 Filing 12 Notice of Appearance filed by David M. Duke on behalf of All Defendants. (Duke, David)
November 2, 2018 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance filed by David Aaron Senter, Jr on behalf of All Defendants. (Senter, David)
October 29, 2018 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by Definitive Staffing Solutions, Inc.. Amendment to #9 Amended Document with exhibits filed separately (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service for Coastal Group, #2 Exhibit B - Proof of Service for Staffing Advantage) (Stanfield, Kevin) Modified on 10/30/2018 to clarify docket text. (Tripp, S.).
October 29, 2018 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #9 Amended Document. Counsel is directed to refile because the attachments/exhibits (pages 6-11) should be filed as separate pdfs attached to the main document. See Section V.E.1(d) of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. (Collins, S.)
October 26, 2018 Filing 9 *Disregard: Corrected and refiled at #10 * AMENDED DOCUMENT by Definitive Staffing Solutions, Inc.. Amendment to #8 Affidavit of Service with corrected signature and service dates. (Stanfield, Kevin) Modified on 10/30/2018 (Tripp, S.).
October 26, 2018 Filing 8 **Disregard - Corrected and refiled at #10 ** Affidavit of Service for Complaint filed by Definitive Staffing Solutions, Inc. served on The Coastal Group, Inc.; Staffing Advantage, LLC on 10/19/18; 10/23/18. (Stanfield, Kevin) Modified on 10/29/2018 (Collins, S.).
October 26, 2018 Filing 7 Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Definitive Staffing Solutions, Inc.. (Stanfield, Kevin)
October 26, 2018 Filing 6 Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Definitive Staffing Solutions, Inc.. Sandra L Gore waiver sent on 10/19/2018, answer due 12/18/2018. (Stanfield, Kevin)
October 26, 2018 Filing 5 Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Definitive Staffing Solutions, Inc.. Randal E Gore waiver sent on 10/19/2018, answer due 12/18/2018. (Stanfield, Kevin)
October 16, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Randal E Gore, Sandra L Gore, Staffing Advantage, L.L.C., The Coastal Group, Inc. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*). (Rudd, D.)
October 16, 2018 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Horton, B.)
October 15, 2018 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by Definitive Staffing Solutions, Inc. (Stanfield, Kevin)
October 15, 2018 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Kevin J. Stanfield on behalf of Definitive Staffing Solutions, Inc.. (Stanfield, Kevin)
October 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Randal E Gore, Sandra L Gore, Staffing Advantage, L.L.C., The Coastal Group, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-4688552.), filed by Definitive Staffing Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposal, #2 Exhibit B - Affiliation Agreement, #3 Exhibit C - Sample Invoice, #4 Proposed Summons - Staffing Advantage, LLC, #5 Proposed Summons - The Coastal Group Inc., #6 Proposed Summons - Randal E. Gore, #7 Proposed Summons - Sandra L. Gore, #8 Civil Cover Sheet) (Stanfield, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Definitive Staffing Solutions, Inc. v. Staffing Advantage, L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Definitive Staffing Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin J. Stanfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Coastal Group, Inc.
Represented By: David M. Duke
Represented By: David Aaron Senter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randal E Gore
Represented By: David M. Duke
Represented By: David Aaron Senter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra L Gore
Represented By: David M. Duke
Represented By: David Aaron Senter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Staffing Advantage, L.L.C.
Represented By: David M. Duke
Represented By: David Aaron Senter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?