Poore v. Evans et al
Plaintiff: Amanda M. Poole and Amanda M. Poore
Defendant: Mary Jane Winchester, Remax/REIII Properties, Choice Jacksonville Realty and Ray Evans, III
Case Number: 7:2018cv00194
Filed: October 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2018 Filing 9 JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the memorandum and recommendation of Magistrate Judge Numbers [DE 4] is ADOPTED. Plaintiff's application to proceed informa pauperis is GRANTED but her complaint is DISMISSED. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 12/13/2018. Copy sent via US Mail to Amanda M. Poore at 636 Maynard Blvd., Jacosonville, NC 28546. (Stouch, L.)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER adopting #4 Memorandum and Recommendations. Signed by Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 12/13/2018. Copy sent via US Mail to Amanda M. Poore at 636 Maynard Blvd., Jacosonville, NC 28546. (Stouch, L.)
December 12, 2018 Motion Submitted to Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle regarding #4 MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Amanda M. Poore. (Stouch, L.)
December 11, 2018 Filing 7 Letter from Amanda Poore (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Envelope) (Stouch, L.)
December 11, 2018 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Choice Jacksonville Realty, Ray Evans, III, Mary Jane Winchester filed by Amanda M. Poore. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope) (Stouch, L.)
November 27, 2018 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Amanda M. Poore. (Stouch, L.)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER and MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Amanda M. Poore. Objections to Memorandum and Recommendations due by 12/10/2018. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II on 11/26/2018. Copy sent to Amanda M. Poore via US Mail to 636 Maynard Blvd., Jacosonville, NC 28546 (Stouch, L.)
October 25, 2018 Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II regarding #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Sellers, N.)
October 24, 2018 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Amanda M. Poole. (Rudd, D.)
October 24, 2018 Filing 2 Notice of Self-Representation filed by Amanda M. Poole. (Rudd, D.)
October 24, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Amanda M. Poole. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons) (Rudd, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Poore v. Evans et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda M. Poole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda M. Poore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Jane Winchester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Remax/REIII Properties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Choice Jacksonville Realty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Evans, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?