Liles v. Wyman et al
Plaintiff: Jamie Liles
Defendant: Lawrence Wyman and Norfolk Dredging Company
Case Number: 7:2018cv00210
Filed: December 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #23 Motion for Extension of Time Joint Motion for Extension of Rule 26 Conference. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 1/29/2019. (Collins, S.)
January 29, 2019 Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan regarding #23 MOTION for Extension of Time Joint Motion for Extension of Rule 26 Conference. (Collins, S.)
January 29, 2019 Filing 24 Proposed Order regarding #23 MOTION for Extension of Time filed by Jamie Liles. (Hanley, Andrew)
January 28, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #23 Motion for Extension of Time. At the direction of the court, counsel shall file a proposed order. The order must be filed electronically using the event PROPOSED ORDER located in the RESPONSES AND REPLIES category. (Collins, S.)
January 28, 2019 Filing 23 Motion for Extension of Time Joint Motion for Extension of Rule 26 Conference filed by Jamie Liles. (Hanley, Andrew) Modified on 1/29/2019 to clarify docket text. (Collins, S.).
January 22, 2019 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Horton, B.)
January 22, 2019 Filing 20 ANSWER to #19 Amended Complaint by Norfolk Dredging Company. (Gasch, Deedee)
January 14, 2019 Filing 22 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Lawrence R. Wyman. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Collins, S.)
January 14, 2019 Filing 21 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Lawrence R. Wyman. (Collins, S.)
January 8, 2019 Filing 19 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jamie Liles. (Hanley, Andrew)
January 7, 2019 Filing 18 Summons Issued as to Lawrence Wyman. *NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.* (Tripp, S.)
January 7, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #17 Amended Complaint - Filing is not text searchable. Local Civil Rule 5.1 and Section IV(A) of the court's CM/ECF policies and procedures manual require that all documents submitted for filing be in a text searchable format. Counsel is directed to refile. Instructions for how to make a document text searchable is located on the court's website under the "CM/ECF" section in the "instructional guides" category. (Tripp, S.)
January 3, 2019 Filing 17 *CORRECTED AND REFILED AT #19 * AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jamie Liles. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons) (Hanley, Andrew) Modified on 1/8/2019 (Tripp, S.).
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING - Discovery Plan due by 1/28/19. Counsel should read attached order in its entirety for critical information and deadlines. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 12/21/2018. (A copy of this Order was sent via US mail to Lawrence Wyman, 532 Holden Beach Road SW, Shallotte, NC 28470-1713.) (Collins, S.)
December 21, 2018 Filing 15 Mail Dated 12/4/18 Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Lawrence R. Wyman, 532 Holden Beach Road SW, Shallotte, NC 28470. (Collins, S.)
December 20, 2018 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint by Norfolk Dredging Company. (Gasch, Deedee)
December 19, 2018 Filing 13 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Lawrence R. Wyman at 606 Tucker Lane, Coca, FL 32926. (Rudd, D.)
December 17, 2018 Filing 12 Financial Disclosure Statement by Jamie Liles (Hanley, Andrew)
December 17, 2018 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance filed by Andrew J. Hanley on behalf of Jamie Liles. (Hanley, Andrew)
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Amend #5 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 12/5/2018. (Collins, S.)
December 5, 2018 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #6 Corrected MOTION to Amend #5 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. (Collins, S.)
December 4, 2018 Filing 9 Notice filed by Norfolk Dredging Company Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet. (Gasch, Deedee)
December 4, 2018 Filing 8 Proposed Order regarding #6 Corrected MOTION to Amend/Correct #5 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Norfolk Dredging Company. (Gasch, Deedee)
December 4, 2018 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #6 Motion to Amend/Correct. At the direction of the court, counsel shall file a proposed order. The order must be filed electronically using the event PROPOSED ORDER located in the RESPONSES AND REPLIES category. Additionally, the judge's practice preferences MAY require counsel to email the proposed order in a word processing format. (Rudd, D.)
December 4, 2018 Filing 7 Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Plaintiff's Counsel Andrew Hanley of Crossley McIntosh Collier Hanley & Edes, PLLC at 5002 Randall Parkway, Wilmington, NC 28403 and a copy along with a blank notice of self representation and a blank financial disclosure statement mailed via US Mail to Lawrence R. Wyman at 606 Tucker Lane, Cocoa, FL 32926 and 532 Holden Beach Road SW, Shallotte, NC 28470-1713 mailed via US Mail on December 4, 2018. (Rudd, D.)
December 4, 2018 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Notice of Removal - Counsel has filed to attach the Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet as required by Local Rule 5.3(a). This form can be found on the court's website and can be filed using the event "Notice-Other". Counsel should add as attachments any other documents required under Local Rule 5.3(a) that have not already been filed. (Rudd, D.)
December 4, 2018 Filing 6 Corrected MOTION to Amend #5 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Norfolk Dredging Company. (Gasch, Deedee) Modified on 12/5/2018 to create link to #1 . (Collins, S.).
December 4, 2018 Filing 5 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Norfolk Dredging Company. (Gasch, Deedee)
December 4, 2018 Filing 4 Financial Disclosure Statement by Norfolk Dredging Company (Gasch, Deedee)
December 3, 2018 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by Norfolk Dredging Company (Gasch, Deedee)
December 3, 2018 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Deedee Rouse Gasch on behalf of Norfolk Dredging Company. (Gasch, Deedee)
December 3, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Norfolk Dredging Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-4745169), filed by Norfolk Dredging Company. (Attachments: #1 Exh. 1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exh. 2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exh. 3 General Civil Action Cover Sheet, #4 Exh. 4 Civil Summons, #5 Exh. 5 Complaint, #6 Exh. 6 Service of Process, #7 Exh. 7 - Motion for Extension of Time) (Gasch, Deedee) Modified on 12/5/2018 to clean up docket text. (Collins, S.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Liles v. Wyman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Liles
Represented By: Andrew J. Hanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence Wyman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Dredging Company
Represented By: Deedee Rouse Gasch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?