Cheney v. CFT Auto Investors, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Texas Neil Cheney
Defendant: CFT Auto Investors, LLC, Hendrick Automotive Group, Hendrick Toyota of Wilmington, Hendrick Corporation, LLC and JL Hendrick Management Corporation
Case Number: 7:2018cv00211
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2019 TEXT ORDER granting Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time #12 . For good cause shown and with the consent of Defendants, it is ordered that Plaintiff shall have up to and including February 19, 2019, within which to respond to the Motion to Dismiss #10 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 1/31/2019. (Hockaday, A.)
January 31, 2019 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #12 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response. (Stouch, L.)
January 31, 2019 Filing 12 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by Texas Neil Cheney. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Lorello, Harry)
January 14, 2019 Filing 11 Memorandum in Support regarding #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by CFT Auto Investors, LLC, Hendrick Automotive Group, Hendrick Corporation, LLC, Hendrick Toyota of Wilmington, JL Hendrick Management Corporation. (Gasch, Deedee)
January 14, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by CFT Auto Investors, LLC, Hendrick Automotive Group, Hendrick Corporation, LLC, Hendrick Toyota of Wilmington, JL Hendrick Management Corporation. (Gasch, Deedee)
December 20, 2018 TEXT ORDER granting Defendants' Second Consent Motion for Extension of Time #9 . For good cause shown, it is ordered that Defendants shall have up to and including January 14, 2019, within which to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 12/20/2018. (Hockaday, A.)
December 20, 2018 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #9 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint. (Stouch, L.)
December 20, 2018 Filing 9 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint filed by CFT Auto Investors, LLC, Hendrick Automotive Group, Hendrick Corporation, LLC, Hendrick Toyota of Wilmington, JL Hendrick Management Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Gasch, Deedee)
December 18, 2018 Filing 8 Financial Disclosure Statement by Texas Neil Cheney (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Service) (Lorello, Harry)
December 18, 2018 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by Harry Lorello on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Lorello, Harry)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal. All Defendants answer due 1/3/2019. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 12/7/2018. Copy sent to Plaintiff's counsel Harry Lorello of Everett, Womble & Lawrence, LLP at PO Drawer 1678, Goldsboro, NC 27533 mailed via US mail on December 7, 2018. (Stouch, L.)
December 7, 2018 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint. (Stouch, L.)
December 7, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint filed by CFT Auto Investors, LLC, Hendrick Automotive Group, Hendrick Corporation, LLC, Hendrick Toyota of Wilmington, JL Hendrick Management Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Gasch, Deedee)
December 7, 2018 Filing 4 Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Plaintiff's counsel Harry Lorello of Everett, Womble & Lawrence, LLP at PO Drawer 1678, Goldsboro, NC 27533 mailed via US mail on December 7, 2018. (Rudd, D.)
December 7, 2018 Notice to Counsel - Counsel is reminded that the court prefers flattened pdf fillable forms. Counsel should "flatten" the JS44 Civil Cover Sheet and the Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet prior to attaching it in accordance with Section IV.B of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. No further action needed. (Rudd, D.)
December 6, 2018 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by CFT Auto Investors, LLC, Hendrick Automotive Group, Hendrick Corporation, LLC, Hendrick Toyota of Wilmington, JL Hendrick Management Corporation (Gasch, Deedee)
December 6, 2018 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Deedee Rouse Gasch on behalf of All Defendants. (Gasch, Deedee)
December 6, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-4751146), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Supplemental Cover Sheet, #3 Index Index of Exhibits, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - General Civil Superior Action Cover Sheet, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Civil Summons to CFT Auto Investors, #6 Exhibit Civil Summons to JL Hendrick Management Corp., #7 Exhibit Civil Summons to Hendrick Toyota of Wilmington, #8 Exhibit Civil Summons Hendrick Automotive Group, #9 Exhibit Civil Summons to Hendrick Corporation, LLC, #10 Exhibit Complaint, #11 Exhibit Green card evidencing SOP upon CFT Auto Investors, #12 Exhibit Green card evidencing SOP upon JL Hendrick Management, #13 Exhibit Green card evidencing SOP upon Hendrick Toyota of Wilmington, #14 Exhibit Green card evidencing SOP upon Hendrick Corporationk, LLC, #15 Exhibit Motion for EOT to respond to Complaint) (Gasch, Deedee) (Attachment 1 and 2 flattened and replaced on 12/11/2018) (Edwards, S.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cheney v. CFT Auto Investors, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CFT Auto Investors, LLC
Represented By: Deedee Rouse Gasch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hendrick Automotive Group
Represented By: Deedee Rouse Gasch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hendrick Toyota of Wilmington
Represented By: Deedee Rouse Gasch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hendrick Corporation, LLC
Represented By: Deedee Rouse Gasch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JL Hendrick Management Corporation
Represented By: Deedee Rouse Gasch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Texas Neil Cheney
Represented By: Harry Lorello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?