Best v. Marshview Motors, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Teresa Best
Defendant: Marshview Motors, Inc., Credit Acceptance Corporation, Western Surety Company and Danny Graham
Case Number: 7:2019cv00005
Filed: January 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2019 Filing 21 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Credit Acceptance Corporation by Teresa Best (Norris, J.)
February 22, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Settlement as to Marshview Motors, Inc., Danny Graham, and Western Surety Company by Teresa Best (Norris, J.)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 2/21/2019. (Collins, S.)
February 19, 2019 Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan regarding #18 MOTION for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically. (Collins, S.)
February 19, 2019 Motion No Longer Referred to Clerk of Court: #18 MOTION for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically. (Collins, S.)
February 19, 2019 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #18 MOTION for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically. (Collins, S.)
February 18, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically filed by Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Pocock, Donald)
February 7, 2019 NOTICE OF CORRECTION regarding: #15 Motion to Compel Arbitration. The document should have been filed using a motion event. The clerk's office has corrected the filing in this instance. No action on the part of counsel is required. (Collins, S.)
February 6, 2019 Filing 17 Memorandum in Support regarding #15 Motion to Compel Arbitration Award filed by Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Pocock, Donald)
February 6, 2019 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT regarding #15 Motion to Compel Arbitration Award by Credit Acceptance Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Retail Installment Contract, #2 Exhibit Declaration Regarding Electronic Signature, #3 Exhibit 3 - Credit Acceptance Corporation Disclosure, #4 Exhibit 4 - Better Business Bureau Complaint) (Pocock, Donald)
February 6, 2019 Filing 15 Motion to Compel Arbitration against Teresa Best (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0417-4820950), filed by Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Pocock, Donald) Modified on 2/7/2019 to revise filing to reflect motion event. (Collins, S.).
February 5, 2019 Notice to Counsel regarding: #13 Notice of Appearance. The mailing address information in the signature block for Mr. Norris on this document does not match the information the court has in its CM/ECF database. Counsel should email the updated law firm information to the clerk's office at NCED-Attorney-Update@nced.uscourts.gov. Once updated, the new contact information will be reflected on the docket of all cases in which counsel entered an appearance. (Collins, S.)
February 5, 2019 Notice to Counsel regarding: #13 Notice of Appearance, #14 Financial Disclosure Statement. Counsel is reminded that they need to include the judge assignment to the case number on all future filings. The case number should read as 7:19-CV-5-FL. No need to refile anything at this time. (Collins, S.)
February 5, 2019 Filing 14 Financial Disclosure Statement by Teresa Best (Norris, J.)
February 5, 2019 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance filed by J. Matthew Norris on behalf of Teresa Best. (Norris, J.)
January 30, 2019 SECOND Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal - Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Plaintiff's counsel, J. Matthew Norris, via U.S. Mail at PO Box 1318, Wake Forest, NC 27588. (Collins, S.)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Western Surety Company answer due 2/22/2019. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 1/24/2019. (Collins, S.)
January 23, 2019 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal. (Collins, S.)
January 23, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Western Surety Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order) (Price, Jeffrey)
January 23, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance filed by Jeffrey S. Price on behalf of Western Surety Company. (Price, Jeffrey)
January 9, 2019 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Horton, B.)
January 9, 2019 Filing 9 Certificate of Service filed by Credit Acceptance Corporation regarding #7 Notice - other, #8 Notice - other . (Pocock, Donald)
January 9, 2019 Filing 8 Notice filed by Credit Acceptance Corporation regarding #1 Notice of Removal, Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet. (Pocock, Donald)
January 9, 2019 Filing 7 Notice filed by Credit Acceptance Corporation regarding #1 Notice of Removal, Civil Cover Sheet. (Pocock, Donald)
January 9, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Donald R. Pocock on behalf of Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Pocock, Donald)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer - Credit Acceptance Corporation's answer due 2/6/2019. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 1/8/2019. (Tripp, S.)
January 8, 2019 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal. (Tripp, S.)
January 8, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Notice of Removal - Counsel failed to file a JS44 Civil Cover Sheet as required by the court and should file a cover sheet using the event "Notice-(other)" located in the Notices category. (Tripp, S.)
January 8, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Notice of Removal - Counsel has failed to attach the Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet as required by Local Rule 5.3(a). This form can be found on the court's website and can be filed using the event "Notice - Other." Counsel should add as attachments any other documents required under Local Rule 5.3(a) that have not already been filed. (Tripp, S.)
January 8, 2019 Filing 4 Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal - Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Plaintiff's counsel, J. Matthew Norris, via U.S. Mail at PO Box 1318, Wake Forest, NC 27588. (Tripp, S.)
January 8, 2019 Notice to Counsel - Counsel should file a notice of appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Tripp, S.)
January 8, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Pocock, Donald)
January 4, 2019 Filing 2 Financial Disclosure Statement by Credit Acceptance Corporation (Pocock, Donald)
January 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Credit Acceptance Corporation from Brunswick County Superior Court, case number 18 CVS 2113. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-4778354), filed by Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - Letter to Defendants, #3 Exhibit C - Email to Plaintiff's counsel, #4 Exhibit D - Notice to State Court) (Pocock, Donald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Best v. Marshview Motors, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Best
Represented By: J. Matthew Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marshview Motors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Acceptance Corporation
Represented By: Donald R. Pocock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Surety Company
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danny Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?