United States of America v. Morton's Personal Property et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $873.45 in U.S. Currency, Miscellaneous Electronic Equipment, Morton's Personal Property, $10,500.00 in U.S. Currency, 2015 Jeep Patriot, Attitude Edition and $16,590.00 in U.S. Currency
Case Number: 7:2019cv00006
Filed: January 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2019 Filing 6 WARRANT OF ARREST AND NOTICE IN REM - Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 1/25/2019. (Sellers, N.)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 PROPOSED Sealed Motion (available to: Plaintiff United States of America). Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 1/9/2019. (Sellers, N.)
January 8, 2019 Filing 4 Notice Requesting Clerk to Issue Warrant of Arrest filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA . (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Fesak, Matthew)
January 8, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED SEALED MOTION (Selected Participants Only)by United States of America (available to: Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Fesak, Matthew)
January 8, 2019 Filing 2 SEALED Declaration (Selected Participants Only)by United States of America (available to: Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA) regarding #1 Complaint. (Fesak, Matthew) Modified on 1/10/2019 - sealed pursuant to #5 Order. (Sellers, N.)
January 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Forfeiture In Rem against All Defendants, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Fesak, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Morton's Personal Property et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $873.45 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miscellaneous Electronic Equipment
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morton's Personal Property
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $10,500.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2015 Jeep Patriot, Attitude Edition
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $16,590.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Matthew Lee Fesak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?