Mitchell v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: John Mitchell
Defendant: Nancy Berryhill
Case Number: 7:2019cv00028
Filed: February 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:206
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2019 Filing 9 USM 285 Form and USPS Return Receipt - US Attorney General served with summons and complaint on 3/11/2019. (Stouch, L.)
March 20, 2019 Filing 8 USM 285 Form and USPS Return Receipt - Nancy A. Berryhill served with summons and complaint on 3/7/2019. (Stouch, L.)
March 5, 2019 Filing 7 USM 285 Form - US Attorney served with summons and complaint on 3/4/2019. (Stouch, L.)
February 27, 2019 Remark - Certified copy of #4 Order and file-stamped copies of summonses and complaint forwarded to the United States Marshal for service, along with USM-285 Forms. (Stouch, L.)
February 27, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Nancy Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Stouch, L.)
February 27, 2019 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Nancy Berryhill filed by John Mitchell. (Stouch, L.)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II on 2/27/2019. (Stouch, L.)
February 22, 2019 Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II regarding #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Stouch, L.)
February 15, 2019 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by John Mitchell (Hall, Charlotte)
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Charlotte Williams Hall on behalf of John Mitchell. (Hall, Charlotte)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis , filed by John Mitchell. (Attachments: #1 US Marshal Form, #2 Complaint, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hall, Charlotte)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitchell v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Mitchell
Represented By: Charlotte Williams Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?