Southern Roots Farming Company, LLC v. CFG Financial Services, LLC et al

Appellant: Southern Roots Farming Company, LLC
Appellee: Wayne Bailey, Inc., CFG Financial Services, LLC and Castellini Company, LLC
Interested Party: Clerk of Court Stephanie Butler
Case Number: 7:2019cv00038
Filed: February 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Referring Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2019 Filing 17 Notice to Parties Regarding Filing of Bankruptcy Record on Appeal. Briefs must be filed in accordance with Rule 8018 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure. (Sellers, N.)
April 25, 2019 Filing 16 Certificate of Readiness and Completion of Record filed by the Bankruptcy Court. (McNeill, A)
April 25, 2019 Filing 15 SEALED BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on November 5, 2018, before Judge Stephani W. Humrickhouse. Court Reporter/Transcriber Access Transcripts, LLC. This document must be accessed through the originating Bankruptcy Court.. (McNeill, A)
April 25, 2019 Filing 14 SEALED BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on Octobter 25, 2018, before Judge Stephani W. Humrickhouse. Court Reporter/Transcriber Access Transcripts, LLC. This document must be accessed through the originating Bankruptcy Court.. (McNeill, A)
April 25, 2019 Filing 13 SEALED BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on October 18, 2018, before Judge Stephani W. Humrickhouse. Court Reporter/Transcriber Access Transcripts, LLC. This document must be accessed through the originating Bankruptcy Court. (McNeill, A)
April 25, 2019 Filing 12 Appellee Bankruptcy Record on Appeal filed. Transmitting copy of docket sheet. The Bankruptcy Court certifies that this is a true and accurate copy of the docket on file.. (Attachments: #1 Docket of Bankruptcy Court Proceeding) (McNeill, A)
April 25, 2019 Filing 11 Appellant's Bankruptcy Record on Appeal filed. Transmitting copy of docket sheet. The Bankruptcy Court certifies that this is a true and accurate copy of the docket on file.. (Attachments: #1 Documents 1, 2, 3, 4, and 5 from Designations, #2 Documents 8, 9, 10, 11, 12, 13, 14, and 15 from Designations, #3 Documents 16, 17, 18, 19, 20, 21, 22, 23, 24, 25, 26, 30 and 31 from Designations, #4 PACA Proof of Claim Form of Southern Roots Farming Company, LLC filed April 13, 2018, #5 Amended PACA Proof of Claim Form of Southern Roots Farming Company, LLC filed July 17, 2018) (McNeill, A)
April 25, 2019 Filing 10 Financial Disclosure Statement by Southern Roots Farming Company, LLC (Mills, David)
April 25, 2019 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance filed by David F. Mills on behalf of Southern Roots Farming Company, LLC. (Mills, David)
March 6, 2019 Filing 8 Financial Disclosure Statement by Wayne Bailey, Inc. (Crampton, Gregory)
March 5, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by Steven Craig Newton, II on behalf of Wayne Bailey, Inc.. (Newton, Steven)
March 5, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Gregory Byrd Crampton on behalf of Wayne Bailey, Inc.. (Crampton, Gregory)
March 1, 2019 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. At the direction of the Court, this case is reassigned to United States District Judge James C. Dever III for all further proceedings. Chief United States District Judge Terrence W. Boyle is no longer assigned to the case. All future filings shall reflect the revised case number of 7:19-CV-38-D. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 3/1/2019. (Hockaday, A.)
February 28, 2019 Notice to Counsel - All Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
February 28, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Docketing and Briefing Deadline regarding #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. (Rudd, D.)
February 27, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by John Paul Cournoyer on behalf of CFG Financial Services, LLC. (Cournoyer, John)
February 27, 2019 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by CFG Financial Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Carolina Financial Group, LLC, Corporate Parent CFG Holdings, Inc. for CFG Financial Services, LLC. (Northen, John)
February 27, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by John A. Northen on behalf of CFG Financial Services, LLC. (Northen, John)
February 27, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 18-00284-5-SWH. File received. (Attachments: #1 Order Under Appeal - Judge Humrickhouse's Order of February 14, 2019) (McNeill, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Southern Roots Farming Company, LLC v. CFG Financial Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Southern Roots Farming Company, LLC
Represented By: David F. Mills
Represented By: Gregory Adam Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Wayne Bailey, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory Byrd Crampton
Represented By: Steven Craig Newton, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: CFG Financial Services, LLC
Represented By: John Paul Cournoyer
Represented By: John A. Northen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Castellini Company, LLC
Represented By: Mark A. Amendola
Represented By: Christopher M Corrigan
Represented By: Matthew Hallman Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Clerk of Court Stephanie Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?