Porters Neck Country Club, Inc. v. Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.) Inc.
Plaintiff: Porters Neck Country Club, Inc.
Defendant: Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.) Inc.
Case Number: 7:2019cv00061
Filed: March 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER regarding #16 Notice of Settlement. The parties are therefore DIRECTED to file a stipulation of dismissal within thirty (30) days of the date of this order, subject to the right of any party to provide notice to the Court within that time that the settlement will not be consummated. Failure to comply with this order will result in this matter being dismissed with prejudice at the close of the thirty-day period. Further, the parties request the Court stay all pending deadlines in this matter. The request is ALLOWED and all deadlines in the case are hereby STAYED through August 7, 2019. Signed by Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 7/10/2019. (Stouch, L.)
July 8, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Settlement /Dispute Resolution and Request for Stay by Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.) Inc. (Aul, Patrick)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically. Signed by Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 6/10/2019. Copy of order sent to financial unit via email. (Stouch, L.)
June 6, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically - Duplicate Filing Fee filed by Porters Neck Country Club, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Pay.gov Payment Receipt, #2 Exhibit B - Credit Card Receipt, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Dale, Alexander)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER FOR DISCOVERY PLAN sent to all parties. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 5/20/2019. (Stouch, L.)
May 17, 2019 Filing 12 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.) Inc.. (Aul, Patrick)
May 1, 2019 TEXT ORDER granting Defendant's Consent Motion for Extension of Time #11 . For good cause shown, it is ordered that Defendant has up to and including May 17, 2019, within which to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint #1 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 5/1/2019. (Hockaday, A.)
May 1, 2019 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. (Love, L.)
May 1, 2019 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint, filed by Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.) Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Aul, Patrick)
April 15, 2019 Filing 10 Financial Disclosure Statement by Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.) Inc. (Aul, Patrick)
April 15, 2019 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance filed by Patrick M. Aul on behalf of All Defendants. (Aul, Patrick)
April 5, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Finley T.R. Harckham on behalf of Porters Neck Country Club, Inc.. (Harckham, Finley)
April 4, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Nicholas R. Maxwell on behalf of Porters Neck Country Club, Inc.. (Maxwell, Nicholas)
April 4, 2019 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #5 Summons Issued Acknowledgement filed by Porters Neck Country Club, Inc.. (Dale, Alexander)
March 21, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.) Inc. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*). (Rudd, D.)
March 21, 2019 Notice to Counsel - Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 10.1(c), except for the initial filing, the case shall bear the case number assigned by the clerk. No further action is needed. (Rudd, D.)
March 20, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Michael J. Parrish on behalf of Porters Neck Country Club, Inc.. (Parrish, Michael)
March 20, 2019 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by Porters Neck Country Club, Inc. (Dale, Alexander)
March 20, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Alexander C. Dale on behalf of Porters Neck Country Club, Inc.. (Dale, Alexander)
March 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND JURY TRIAL DEMAND against Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.) Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-4875399.), filed by Porters Neck Country Club, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - AWAC Policy, #2 Exhibit B - Servpro Agreement, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Dale, Alexander)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Porters Neck Country Club, Inc. v. Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.) Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Porters Neck Country Club, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Parrish
Represented By: Alexander C. Dale
Represented By: Nicholas R. Maxwell
Represented By: Finley T.R. Harckham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.) Inc.
Represented By: Patrick M. Aul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?