Norton v. Columbus County Board of Elections et al
Plaintiff: Calvin Tyrone Norton
Defendant: Harold Fipps, Jerome McMillian, Columbus County Board of Elections, Giles E. Byrd, Jess Hill, Brenden Jones, Columbus County Board of Commissioners, Scott Andrew Yates, Danny Earl Britt, Jr., Norwood P. Blanchard, Bonita Blakney, Boyd T. Worley, Aaron Herring, Leslie Macrae Dowless Jr., Red Dome Group, Inc., Trent Burroughs, Ricky Bullard, James E. Prevatte, Jody Steadman Greene, Tucker (Mack) Ward, Edwin P. Russ, Amanda Prince, Charles McDowell, Carla Strickland, Lewis L. Hatcher, Joann Garrell and Western Surety Co.
Interested Party: Stella Anderson, Bob Cordle, David Black, Ken Raymond, Jeff Carmon and North Carolina State Board of Elections
Case Number: 7:2019cv00088
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Referring Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding #65 MOTION for Leave of Court to File Manually. (Sellers, N.)
July 1, 2019 Filing 75 Rule 12 Letter Issued as to #70 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Response due by 7/23/2019. (Sellers, N.)
July 1, 2019 Filing 74 Rule 12 Letter Issued as to #68 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Response due by 7/22/2019. (Sellers, N.)
July 1, 2019 Filing 73 Rule 12 Letter Issued as to #66 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Response due by 7/22/2019. (Sellers, N.)
July 1, 2019 Filing 72 Memorandum in Support regarding #70 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Norwood P. Blanchard. (Blanchard, Norwood)
June 30, 2019 Filing 71 AMENDED Memorandum in Support regarding #68 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Bonita Blakney, Columbus County Board of Elections, Harold Fipps, Joann Garrell, Amanda Prince, Carla Strickland, Tucker (Mack) Ward. Amendment to #69 Memorandum in Support. (Blanchard, Norwood) Modified on 7/1/2019 - added docket entry relationship and changed docket text to clarify document attached. (Sellers, N.)
June 29, 2019 Filing 70 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Norwood P. Blanchard. (Blanchard, Norwood)
June 28, 2019 Filing 69 DISREGARD. Corrected and re-filed at #71 . Memorandum in Support regarding #68 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Bonita Blakney, Columbus County Board of Elections, Harold Fipps, Joann Garrell, Amanda Prince, Carla Strickland, Tucker (Mack) Ward. (Blanchard, Norwood) Modified on 7/1/2019 (Sellers, N.).
June 28, 2019 Filing 68 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Bonita Blakney, Columbus County Board of Elections, Harold Fipps, Joann Garrell, Amanda Prince, Carla Strickland, Tucker (Mack) Ward. (Blanchard, Norwood)
June 28, 2019 Filing 67 Memorandum in Support regarding #66 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Ricky Bullard, Trent Burroughs, Giles E. Byrd, Columbus County Board of Commissioners, Charles McDowell, Jerome McMillian, James E. Prevatte, Edwin P. Russ. (Blanchard, Norwood)
June 28, 2019 Filing 66 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Ricky Bullard, Trent Burroughs, Giles E. Byrd, Columbus County Board of Commissioners, Charles McDowell, Jerome McMillian, James E. Prevatte, Edwin P. Russ. (Blanchard, Norwood)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MOTION for Leave of Court to File Manually filed by Danny Earl Britt, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Waiver of Service of Summons as to Danny Earl Britt, Jr., #3 Notice of Appearance, #4 Motion to Dismiss and Motion for Prefiling Injunction on behalf of Danny Earl Britt Jr., #5 Memo in support of Danny Earl Britt's Motion to Dismiss, #6 Britt Motion Exhibit Index, #7 Exhibit 1 - Judge Sasser's 5/14/12 Order entered in 12 CVS 438, #8 Exhibit 2 - Amended Order entered by Judge Sasser on 10/28/16 in 12-R-74, #9 Exhibit 3 - Amended Complaint in the State Court Election Action, #10 Exhibit 4 - Answer in the State Court Election Action, #11 Exhibit 5 - Order entered on 5/29/19 by the NC State Board of Elections, #12 Exhibit 6 - June 7, 2019 Notice of Appeal, #13 Exhibit 7 - June 7, 2019 Complaint filed in Wake County Superior Court - 19 CVS 7671, #14 Exhibit 8 - June 7, 2019 Motion for Stay of Issuance of Certification, #15 Exhibit 9 - June 14, 2019 Order entered by the Judge Bryan Collins in Wake County Superior Court, #16 Exhibit 10 - Order entered by Judge Boyle in Jilani v. Freeman et al., 5:17-ct-3150-BO, #17 Motion to Dismiss and Motion for Prefiling Injunction on Behalf of Brenden Jones, #18 Memo in support of Brenden Jones' Motion to Dismiss, #19 Index of Exhibits for Jones' Motion, #20 Exhibit 1 - Judge Sasser's 5/14/12 Order entered in 12 CVS 438, #21 Exhibit 2 - Amended Order entered by Judge Sasser on 10/28/16 in 12-R-74, #22 Exhibit 3 - Amended Complaint in the State Court Election Action, #23 Exhibit 4 - Answer in the State Court Election Action, #24 Exhibit 5 - Order entered on May 29, 2019 by the NC State Board of Elections, #25 Exhibit 6 - June 7, 2019 Notice of Appeal, #26 Exhibit 7 - June 7, 2019 Complaint filed in Wake County Superior Court - 19 CVS 7671, #27 Exhibit 8 - June 7, 2019 Motion for Stay of Issuance of Certification, #28 Exhibit 9 - June 14, 2019 Order entered by the Judge Bryan Collins in Wake County Superior Court, #29 Exhibit 10 - Order entered by Judge Boyle in Jilani v. Freeman et al., No. 5:17-ct-3150-BO) (Sellers, N.)
June 27, 2019 Filing 64 Notice of Appearance filed by Michael B. Cohen on behalf of Jody Steadman Greene. (Cohen, Michael)
June 27, 2019 Filing 63 RESPONSE in Opposition regarding #54 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Calvin Tyrone Norton. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Sellers, N.)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting #61 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Aaron Herring answer due 8/2/2019. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 6/25/2019. Sent to Calvin Tyrone Norton at PO Box 1145 Whiteville, NC 28472 via US Mail. (Sellers, N.)
June 24, 2019 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #61 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. (Sellers, N.)
June 24, 2019 Filing 61 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Aaron Herring. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Blanchard, Norwood)
June 24, 2019 Filing 60 Financial Disclosure Statement by Aaron Herring (Blanchard, Norwood)
June 24, 2019 Filing 59 Notice of Appearance filed by Norwood P. Blanchard, III on behalf of Aaron Herring. (Blanchard, Norwood)
June 24, 2019 Filing 58 RESPONSE in Opposition regarding #11 MOTION for Joinder filed by Stella Anderson, David Black, Jeff Carmon, Bob Cordle, North Carolina State Board of Elections, Ken Raymond. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F) (Cox, Paul)
June 24, 2019 Filing 57 Notice of Appearance filed by Paul M. Cox on behalf of North Carolina State Board of Elections, Bob Cordle, Stella Anderson, Jeff Carmon, David Black, Ken Raymond. (Cox, Paul)
June 24, 2019 Filing 56 Rule 12 Letter Issued as to #54 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. Response due by 7/15/2019. Sent to Calvin Tyrone Norton at PO Box 1145 Whiteville, NC 28472 via US Mail. (Sellers, N.)
June 21, 2019 Filing 55 Memorandum in Support regarding #54 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Boyd T. Worley. (Attachments: #1 Index Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 10) (Coats, David)
June 21, 2019 Filing 54 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Boyd T. Worley. (Coats, David)
June 19, 2019 Filing 53 Document: Proof of Service as to Aaron Herring. (Sellers, N.)
June 19, 2019 Filing 52 Document: Proof of Service as to Steadman Jody Greene. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Sellers, N.)
June 17, 2019 Filing 51 MOTION for Emergency Hearing regarding #50 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Calvin Tyrone Norton. (Sellers, N.)
June 17, 2019 Filing 50 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Calvin Tyrone Norton. (Attachments: #1 Mr. Norton's Affidavit, #2 Exhibit 10 - Oath of Sheriff, #3 Exhibit 11 - Business Record Affidavit, #4 Exhibit 12 - Wake County Sheriff's Office Receipt, #5 Exhibit 13 - Transcripts of Sheriff of Columbus County Protest Hearing of Gloria Smith, #6 Envelope) (Sellers, N.)
June 13, 2019 Filing 49 RESPONSE in Opposition regarding #36 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Calvin Tyrone Norton. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Stouch, L.)
June 11, 2019 Filing 48 MOTION for Entry of Default against Leslie Macrae Dowlles, Jr. filed by Calvin Tyrone Norton. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Envelope) (Stouch, L.)
June 11, 2019 Filing 47 RESPONSE in Opposition regarding #28 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Calvin Tyrone Norton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notice of Candidacy, #2 Exhibit 2 - Warranty Deed, #3 Exhibit 3 - Letter to plaintiff from NC DPS, #4 Exhibit 4 - Application for Use Value and Taxation, #5 Exhibit 5 - Application for Agriculture, Horticulture, and Forestry Present-Use Value Assessment, #6 Exhibit 6 - Memo from Mike Stephens, #7 Exhibit 7 - Billing & Payment History, #8 Exhibit 8 - Service of Process Transmittal, #9 Exhibit 9 - Public Information Individual Employee for Fire Sergeant, #10 Envelope) (Stouch, L.)
June 10, 2019 Filing 46 Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint - Danny Earl Britt, Jr. unable to be located filed by Calvin Tyrone Norton. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Stouch, L.)
June 10, 2019 Filing 45 Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint - Defendant Ricky Bullard refused mail filed by Calvin Tyrone Norton. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Stouch, L.)
June 10, 2019 Filing 44 Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Edwin P. Russ on 6/3/2019 filed by Calvin Tyrone Norton . (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Stouch, L.)
June 10, 2019 Filing 43 Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Giles Buddy Byrd on 6/7/2019 filed by Calvin Tyrone Norton . (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Stouch, L.)
June 7, 2019 Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding #42 MOTION for Leave of Court to File Manually. (Sellers, N.)
June 7, 2019 Filing 42 MOTION for Leave of Court to File Manually filed by Danny Earl Britt, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appearance, #2 Waiver of Service, #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, #4 Proposed Order for Motion to Extend Time, #5 Text of Proposed Order for Motion for Leave to File Manually) (Sellers, N.)
June 6, 2019 Filing 41 Document: Subpoena to Produce Documents to North Carolina State Board of Elections filed by Calvin Tyrone Norton. (Sellers, N.)
June 6, 2019 Filing 40 Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint filed by Calvin Tyrone Norton served on Harold Fipps on 5/23/2019. (Sellers, N.)
June 6, 2019 Filing 39 Notice of Appearance filed by Dan McCord Hartzog, Jr on behalf of Jody Steadman Greene. (Hartzog, Dan)
June 5, 2019 Filing 38 Rule 12 Letter Issued as to #36 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. Response due by 6/28/2019. Sent to Calvin Tyrone Norton at PO Box 1145Whiteville, NC 28472 via US Mail. (Sellers, N.)
June 4, 2019 Filing 37 Memorandum in Support regarding #36 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Western Surety Co.. (Gibson, Jonathan)
June 4, 2019 Filing 36 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Western Surety Co.. (Gibson, Jonathan)
June 4, 2019 Filing 35 DISREGARD. Corrected and re-filed at #37 . MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by Western Surety Co.. (Gibson, Jonathan) Modified on 6/5/2019 (Sellers, N.).
June 4, 2019 Filing 34 DISREGARD. Corrected and re-filed at #36 . MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Western Surety Co.. (Gibson, Jonathan) Modified on 6/5/2019 (Sellers, N.).
June 4, 2019 Filing 33 Financial Disclosure Statement by Western Surety Co. identifying Corporate Parent CNA Surety, Corporate Parent CNA Financial Corporation for Western Surety Co.. (Gibson, Jonathan)
June 4, 2019 Filing 32 Notice of Appearance filed by Jonathan Whitfield Gibson on behalf of Western Surety Co.. (Gibson, Jonathan)
June 3, 2019 Filing 31 RESPONSE in Opposition regarding #22 First MOTION to Dismiss filed by Calvin Tyrone Norton. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Sellers, N.)
May 30, 2019 Filing 30 Rule 12 Letter Issued as to #28 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Response due by 6/22/2019. Sent to Calvin Tyrone Norton at PO Box 1145 Whiteville, NC 28472 via US Mail. (Sellers, N.)
May 29, 2019 Filing 29 Memorandum in Support regarding #28 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Red Dome Group, Inc., Scott Andrew Yates. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Williams, Kevin)
May 29, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Red Dome Group, Inc., Scott Andrew Yates. (Williams, Kevin)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #26 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Bonita Blakney answer due 6/28/2019; Ricky Bullard answer due 6/28/2019; Trent Burroughs answer due 6/28/2019; Giles E. Byrd answer due 6/28/2019; Columbus County Board of Commissioners answer due 6/28/2019; Columbus County Board of Elections answer due 6/28/2019; Harold Fipps answer due 6/28/2019; Joann Garrell answer due 6/28/2019; Charles McDowell answer due 6/28/2019; Jerome McMillian answer due 6/28/2019; James E. Prevatte answer due 6/28/2019; Amanda Prince answer due 6/28/2019; Edwin P. Russ answer due 6/28/2019; Carla Strickland answer due 6/28/2019; Tucker (Mack) Ward answer due 6/28/2019. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 5/29/2019. Sent to Calvin Tyrone Norton at PO Box 1145 Whiteville, NC 28472 via US Mail. (Sellers, N.)
May 29, 2019 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #26 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. (Sellers, N.)
May 28, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Bonita Blakney, Ricky Bullard, Trent Burroughs, Giles E. Byrd, Columbus County Board of Commissioners, Columbus County Board of Elections, Harold Fipps, Joann Garrell, Charles McDowell, Jerome McMillian, James E. Prevatte, Amanda Prince, Edwin P. Russ, Carla Strickland, Tucker (Mack) Ward. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order) (Blanchard, Norwood)
May 28, 2019 Filing 25 Notice of Appearance filed by Norwood P. Blanchard, III on behalf of Bonita Blakney, Ricky Bullard, Trent Burroughs, Giles E. Byrd, Columbus County Board of Commissioners, Columbus County Board of Elections, Harold Fipps, Joann Garrell, Charles McDowell, Jerome McMillian, James E. Prevatte, Amanda Prince, Edwin P. Russ, Carla Strickland, Tucker (Mack) Ward. (Blanchard, Norwood)
May 28, 2019 Filing 24 Rule 12 Letter Issued as to #22 First MOTION to Dismiss. Response due by 6/21/2019. Sent to Calvin Tyrone Norton at PO Box 1145 Whiteville, NC 28472 via US Mail. (Sellers, N.)
May 28, 2019 Filing 23 Memorandum in Support regarding #22 First MOTION to Dismiss filed by Jess Hill. (Davis, Anna)
May 28, 2019 Filing 22 First MOTION to Dismiss filed by Jess Hill. (Davis, Anna)
May 28, 2019 Filing 21 Notice of Appearance filed by Anna M Davis on behalf of Jess Hill. (Davis, Anna)
May 28, 2019 Filing 20 Notice of Appearance filed by Kathryn H. Shields on behalf of Jess Hill. (Shields, Kathryn)
May 28, 2019 Filing 19 Financial Disclosure Statement by Scott Andrew Yates (Williams, Kevin)
May 28, 2019 Filing 18 Financial Disclosure Statement by Red Dome Group, Inc. (Williams, Kevin)
May 28, 2019 Filing 17 Notice of Appearance filed by Kevin G. Williams on behalf of Red Dome Group, Inc., Scott Andrew Yates. (Williams, Kevin)
May 28, 2019 Filing 16 Notice of Appearance filed by Mark Andrew Jones on behalf of Red Dome Group, Inc., Scott Andrew Yates. (Jones, Mark)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Boyd T. Worley answer due 6/27/2019. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 5/24/2019. Sent to Calvin Tyrone Norton at PO Box 1145 Whiteville, NC 28472 via US Mail. (Sellers, N.)
May 24, 2019 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint. (Sellers, N.)
May 23, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint filed by Boyd T. Worley. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Coats, David)
May 23, 2019 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance filed by David S. Coats on behalf of Boyd T. Worley. (Coats, David)
May 23, 2019 Filing 12 Document: Affidavits of Service as to Leslie Macrae Dowless, Jr., NC House - Brenden Jones, Red Dome Group, Inc. c/o Registered Agent Andy Scott Yates, Western Surety Bondging d/b/a CNA Surety Insurance, Andy Scott Yates filed by Calvin Tyrone Norton. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Sellers, N.)
May 17, 2019 Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding #11 MOTION for Joinder. (Sellers, N.)
May 16, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Join (Collectively) NC State Board of Elections & Members Bob Cordle, Stella Anderson, Jeff Camron, David Black & Ken Raymond filed by Calvin Tyrone Norton. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Sellers, N.)
May 16, 2019 Filing 10 Document: Subpoenas to Produce Documents filed by Calvin Tyrone Norton. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Sellers, N.)
May 10, 2019 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance filed by Andrew Darrell Penny on behalf of Norwood P. Blanchard. (Penny, Andrew)
May 10, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by Norwood P. Blanchard, III on behalf of Norwood P. Blanchard. (Blanchard, Norwood)
May 9, 2019 Filing 7 Document: Proof of Service as to Amanda Prince, Boyd Tyler Worley, Columbus County Board of Commissioners / County Manager Mike Stephens all served on May 7, 2019 filed by Calvin Tyrone Norton. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Sellers, N.)
May 7, 2019 Filing 6 Letter from S. Collins, Deputy Clerk to Calvin Norton regarding Text Order entered this date. (Collins, S.)
May 7, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. At the direction of the Court, this Case is reassigned to District Judge James C. Dever, III for all further proceedings. District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan is no longer assigned to case. All future filings shall reflect the revised case number of 7:19-cv-88-D.Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 5/6/2019. (Moore. P. )
May 3, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Bonita Blakney, Norwood P. Blanchard, Danny Earl Britt, Jr, Ricky Bullard, Trent Burroughs, Giles E. Byrd, Columbus County Board of Commissioners, Columbus County Board of Elections, Leslie Macrae Dowless Jr., Harold Fipps, Joann Garrell, Jody Steadman Greene, Lewis L. Hatcher, Aaron Herring, Jess Hill, Brenden Jones, Charles McDowell, Jerome McMillian, James E. Prevatte, Amanda Prince, Red Dome Group, Inc., Edwin P. Russ, Carla Strickland, Tucker (Mack) Ward, Western Surety Co., Boyd T. Worley, Scott Andrew Yates. (Attachments: #1 Issued summons, #2 Issued summons, #3 Issued summons, #4 Issued summons, #5 Issued summons, #6 Issued summons, #7 Issued summons, #8 Issued summons, #9 Issued summons, #10 Issued summons, #11 Issued summons, #12 Issued summons, #13 Issued summons, #14 Issued summons, #15 Issued summons, #16 Issued summons, #17 Issued summons, #18 Issued summons, #19 Issued summons, #20 Issued summons, #21 Issued summons, #22 Issued summons, #23 Issued summons, #24 Issued summons, #25 Issued summons) Summons issued at intake. (Rudd, D.)
May 3, 2019 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Calvin Tyrone Norton. (Rudd, D.)
May 3, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Self-Representation filed by Calvin Tyrone Norton. (Rudd, D.)
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400.00 receipt number RAL071476), filed by Calvin Tyrone Norton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Rudd, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Norton v. Columbus County Board of Elections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold Fipps
Represented By: Norwood P. Blanchard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerome McMillian
Represented By: Norwood P. Blanchard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbus County Board of Elections
Represented By: Norwood P. Blanchard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Giles E. Byrd
Represented By: Norwood P. Blanchard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jess Hill
Represented By: Kathryn H. Shields
Represented By: Anna M Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenden Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbus County Board of Commissioners
Represented By: Norwood P. Blanchard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Andrew Yates
Represented By: Kevin G. Williams
Represented By: Mark Andrew Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danny Earl Britt, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norwood P. Blanchard
Represented By: Norwood P. Blanchard, III
Represented By: Andrew Darrell Penny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bonita Blakney
Represented By: Norwood P. Blanchard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boyd T. Worley
Represented By: David S. Coats
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Herring
Represented By: Norwood P. Blanchard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie Macrae Dowless Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Red Dome Group, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin G. Williams
Represented By: Mark Andrew Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trent Burroughs
Represented By: Norwood P. Blanchard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricky Bullard
Represented By: Norwood P. Blanchard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James E. Prevatte
Represented By: Norwood P. Blanchard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jody Steadman Greene
Represented By: Dan McCord Hartzog, Jr.
Represented By: Michael B. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tucker (Mack) Ward
Represented By: Norwood P. Blanchard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edwin P. Russ
Represented By: Norwood P. Blanchard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda Prince
Represented By: Norwood P. Blanchard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles McDowell
Represented By: Norwood P. Blanchard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carla Strickland
Represented By: Norwood P. Blanchard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lewis L. Hatcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joann Garrell
Represented By: Norwood P. Blanchard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Surety Co.
Represented By: Jonathan Whitfield Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calvin Tyrone Norton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Stella Anderson
Represented By: Paul M. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Bob Cordle
Represented By: Paul M. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: David Black
Represented By: Paul M. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Ken Raymond
Represented By: Paul M. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Jeff Carmon
Represented By: Paul M. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: North Carolina State Board of Elections
Represented By: Paul M. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?