Bell v. Saul
Plaintiff: LASONYA BELL
Defendant: Acting Commissioner Nancy A. Berryhill, Andrew M. Saul and Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 7:2019cv00092
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2019 Filing 9 USM-285 Form - Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Andy Liu, General Counsel, Office of Program Law Social Security Administration on 5/17/2019. (Sellers, N.)
May 24, 2019 Filing 8 USM-285 Form - Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint served on William Barr, Attorney General of the U.S. on 5/20/2019. (Sellers, N.)
May 23, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Returned Executed by Personal Service as to Nancy A. Berryhill served on 5/20/2019, answer due 7/19/2019. (Sellers, N.)
May 14, 2019 Filing 6 Summonses Issued as to Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Sellers, N.)
May 14, 2019 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill, filed by Lasonya Bell. (Sellers, N.)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 5/14/2019. (Sellers, N.)
May 14, 2019 Remark: Certified copy of #4 Order and file-stamped copies of summonses and complaint forwarded to the United States Marshal for service, along with USM-285 Forms. (Sellers, N.)
May 13, 2019 Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Sellers, N.)
May 10, 2019 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by LASONYA BELL (Clauson, Vaughn)
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Vaughn Stephen Clauson on behalf of LASONYA BELL. (Clauson, Vaughn)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by LASONYA BELL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Proposed Complaint, #3 Proposed Summons US Att'y, #4 Proposed Summons AG-USA, #5 Proposed Summons OGC-SSA) (Clauson, Vaughn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bell v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Commissioner Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LASONYA BELL
Represented By: Vaughn Stephen Clauson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?