B & B Crane Service, LLC v. Dragados USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: B & B Crane Service, LLC
Defendant: JOHN DOE, Dragados USA, Inc. and Thomas Michael Keyes
Case Number: 7:2019cv00098
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #16 Amended Complaint filed by Dragados USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Riemann, Neil)
July 10, 2019 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #16 Amended Complaint. (Sellers, N.)
July 10, 2019 TEXT ORDER granting Defendant Dragados USA Inc.'s unopposed Motion for Extension of Time #17 . For good cause shown, it is ordered that this Defendant has up to and including July 26, 2019, within which to answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint #16 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 7/10/2019. (Hockaday, A.)
July 1, 2019 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by B & B Crane Service, LLC. (Coble, John)
July 1, 2019 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Thomas Michael Keyes. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Sellers, N.)
July 1, 2019 Notice to Counsel regarding: #14 Amended Complaint. Counsel is reminded that all pleadings must comply with Local Rule 10.1(a) in regards to spacing, which you may obtain on the court's website at www.nced.uscourts.gov. Your documents must be double-spaced. Please re-file the document in compliance with this rule. (Sellers, N.)
June 28, 2019 Filing 14 DISREGARD. Corrected and re-filed at #16 . AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by B & B Crane Service, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Thomas Michael Keyes) (Coble, John) Modified on 7/1/2019 (Sellers, N.).
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Dragados must serve its responses to plaintiff's first set of interrogatories and requests for production within thirty days of the Rule 26(f) conference. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 6/20/2019. (Sellers, N.)
June 14, 2019 Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response (or clarification of time). (Sellers, N.)
June 12, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by Dragados USA, Inc.. (Riemann, Neil)
June 12, 2019 Filing 11 Financial Disclosure Statement by B & B Crane Service, LLC (Coble, John)
June 12, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance filed by John L. Coble on behalf of B & B Crane Service, LLC. (Coble, John)
June 4, 2019 Filing 9 Second Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Plaintiff's Counsel Dennis T. Worley and Paul J. Ekster of Wright, Worley, Pope, Ekster & Moss, PLLC at P. O. Box 457, (200 S. Lewis Street), Tabor City, NC 28463. (Sellers, N.)
May 30, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (or clarification of time) filed by Dragados USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Riemann, Neil)
May 23, 2019 Filing 7 Notice filed by Dragados USA, Inc. of Compliance with LR 5.3(a)(2) regarding filing of Notice of Filing Notice of Removal with Brunswick County Superior Court. (Riemann, Neil)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dragados USA, Inc. answer due 6/13/2019. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 5/22/2019. Sent to Dennis T. Worley and Paul J. Ekster at Wright, Worley, Pope, Ekster & Moss, PLLC P. O. Box 457 (200 S. Lewis Street) Tabor City, NC 28463 via US Mail. (Sellers, N.)
May 21, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal, (or Other Response) filed by Dragados USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Riemann, Neil)
May 21, 2019 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal, (or Other Response). (Sellers, N.)
May 17, 2019 Filing 4 Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Plaintiff's Counsel Dennis T. Worley and Paul J. Ekster of Wright, Worley, Pope, Ekster & Moss, PLLC at P. O. Box 457, (200 S. Lewis Street), Tabor City, NC 28463. (Rudd, D.)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by Dragados USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Dragados, S.A., Corporate Parent Actividades de Construccion y Servicios, S.A. for Dragados USA, Inc.. (Riemann, Neil)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Neil A. Riemann on behalf of Dragados USA, Inc.. (Riemann, Neil)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Dragados USA, Inc. from Brunswick County Superior Court, case number 19 CVS 741. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-4947699), filed by Dragados USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Documents Served (less discovery), #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet (could not flatten)) (Riemann, Neil)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: B & B Crane Service, LLC v. Dragados USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dragados USA, Inc.
Represented By: Neil A. Riemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Michael Keyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B & B Crane Service, LLC
Represented By: John L. Coble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?