Richard P. Cook, Plan Trustee for Yahweh Center, Inc.. v. SunTrust Bank

Appellee: SunTrust Bank
Interested Party: Clerk of Court Stephanie Butler
Appellant: Richard P. Cook, Plan Trustee for Yahweh Center, Inc..
Case Number: 7:2019cv00111
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Referring Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 Cases associated: Create association to 7:19-cv-00077-D. (Sellers, N.)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Consolidate Cases. The appeals in Richard P. Cook, Plan Trustee for Yahweh Center, Inc. v. United States of America, Case No.: 7:19-cv-00077-D and Richard P. Cook, Plan Trustee for Yahweh Center, Inc. v. SunTrust Bank, Case No.: 7:19-v-00111-D, are hereby consolidated into a single case in front of United States District Judge James C. Dever, III. (1) Appellant's Brief with a page limit of 50 pages shall be due 30 days from the date this Order is entered; (2) Appellees' respective Briefs of no more than 30 pages in the case of SunTrust and 45 pages in the case of the United States shall be due 45 days from the date Appellant's Brief is filed; and (3) Appellant's Reply Brief of no more than 25 pages shall be due 25 days from date Appellee's Brief is filed. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever, III on 7/23/2019. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever, III on 7/23/2019. (Stouch, L.)
July 23, 2019 Filing 10 Certificate of Readiness and Completion of Record filed by the Bankruptcy Court. (Payne, L.)
July 23, 2019 Filing 9 Appellant's Bankruptcy Record on Appeal Filed. Transmitting copy of docket sheet. The Bankruptcy Court certifies that this is a true and accurate copy of the docket on file. (Attachments: #1 Part 1 of Appelllant's Record/AP, #2 Part 2 of Appellant's Record/AP, #3 Part 3 of Appellant's Record/BK, #4 Amended Proof of Claim #4, #5 Proof of Claim #16 of Dept. of Revenue Filed November 18, 2016, #6 AdversaryProceeding Docket #18-00082) (Payne, L.)
July 19, 2019 Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding #7 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and set a unified briefing schedule. (Sellers, N.)
July 19, 2019 Filing 8 Proposed Order regarding #7 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and set a unified briefing schedule filed by Richard P. Cook, Plan Trustee for Yahweh Center, Inc.., SunTrust Bank. (Cook, Richard)
July 19, 2019 Notice to Counsel regarding: #7 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 7.1(b)(3) and Section V(I)(3) of the CM/ECF Policy and Procedures Manual and Judge Dever's practice preferences, parties must file a proposed order with any non-dispositive motion. Please file a proposed order using the event 'Proposed Order' in the Responses and Replies category and link it back to the motion to which it corresponds. (Sellers, N.)
July 18, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and set a unified briefing schedule filed by Richard P. Cook, Plan Trustee for Yahweh Center, Inc.., SunTrust Bank. (Cook, Richard)
July 3, 2019 Filing 6 Financial Disclosure Statement by SunTrust Bank identifying Corporate Parent SunTrust Bank Holding Company, Corporate Parent SunTrust Banks, Inc. for SunTrust Bank. (Williams, Amy)
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Amy P. Williams on behalf of SunTrust Bank. (Williams, Amy)
June 26, 2019 Filing 4 Financial Disclosure Statement by Richard P. Cook, Plan Trustee for Yahweh Center, Inc.. (Cook, Richard)
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Richard Preston Cook on behalf of Richard P. Cook, Plan Trustee for Yahweh Center, Inc... (Cook, Richard)
June 25, 2019 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. At the direction of the Court, this case is reassigned to United States District Judge James C. Dever III for all further proceedings. United States District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan is no longer assigned to the case. All future filings shall reflect the revised case number of 7:19-CV-111-D. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 6/25/2019. (Hockaday, A.)
June 24, 2019 Notice to Counsel - All Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Docketing and Briefing Deadline regarding #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. (Rudd, D.)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 18-00082-5-JNC. File received. (Attachments: #1 Order Under Appeal Denying Motion to Dismiss - Judge Joseph N. Callaway Order filed March 22, 2019, #2 Order Under Appeal Denying Motion For Leave to Amend Complaint with Respect to SunTrust Bank - Judge Joseph N. Callaway Order filed June 5, 2019) (Payne, L.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richard P. Cook, Plan Trustee for Yahweh Center, Inc.. v. SunTrust Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: SunTrust Bank
Represented By: Amy P. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Clerk of Court Stephanie Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Richard P. Cook, Plan Trustee for Yahweh Center, Inc..
Represented By: Richard Preston Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?