Hurdle v. Camp Lejeune, USMC et al
Plaintiff: Margie M King Hurdle
Defendant: Camp Lejeune Water Supply, Veteran Adm, City of Jacksonville, NC, Congress of USA, Off Base Dry Cleaners, Camp Lejeune, USMC, Department of the Navy, A-1 Dry Cleaners, Jacksonville Water Supply Company, Dept. of JAG and U.S. Government
Case Number: 7:2019cv00115
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Malcolm J Howard
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Self-Representation filed by Margie M King Hurdle. (Rudd, D.)
July 22, 2019 Filing 7 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit (Selected Participants Only)by Margie M King Hurdle. *Exhibits temporarily sealed due to the fact that they contain personal identifiers. (Rudd, D.)
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against A-1 Dry Cleaners, Camp Lejeune Water Supply, Camp Lejeune, USMC, City of Jacksonville, NC, Congress of USA, Dept. of JAG, Jacksonville Water Supply Company, U.S. Government, Veteran Administration, filed by Margie M King Hurdle. (Attachments: #1 Cover letter, #2 Envelope, #3 Proposed Summons) (Rudd, D.)
July 3, 2019 Filing 9 Document: Brief In Support of Defendant United States' Motion for Transfer of Actions. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Schedule of Actions, #2 Exhibit 1- Cerfiticate of Service, #3 Exhibit 2- Docket Sheet of District of New Hampshire case 1:19-cv-128-JD, #4 Exhibit 3- Exhibit 3 - Docket Sheet of Eastern District of North Carolina case 5:19-cv-97-BO, #5 Exhibit 4- Exhibit 4 - Docket Sheet of Eastern District of North Carolina case 7:19-cv-67-BO, #6 Exhibit 5-Docket Sheet of Eastern District of North Carolina case 5:19-cv-241-FL, #7 Exhibit 6- Docket Sheet of Eastern District of North Carolina case 7:19-cv-112-BO, #8 Exhibit 7- Docket Sheet of Eastern District of North Carolina case 7:19-cv-115-H, #9 Exhibit 8- Docket Sheet of Northern District of Georgia case 1:19-cv-02787-ELR) (Rudd, D.)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and directs the Clerk to provide Plaintiff with a copy of the court's pro se complaint packet. It is further ORDERED as follows: 1. On or before July 26, 2019, Plaintiff shall particularize her complaint with a list containing the names of each of the defendants she seeks to sue and, as to each defendant, the facts upon which her claims are based. 2. On or before July 26, 2019, Plaintiff shall submit a properly completed and signed notice of self-representation. 3. On or before July 26, 2019, Plaintiff shall submit for each named defendant a properly completed summons for service pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. 4. After Plaintiff has submitted the above items, the court will determine whether any of Plaintiffs claims should be dismissed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B). Plaintiff is warned that failure to comply with this order may result in her action being dismissed without further action by the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Swank on 6/26/2019. (Rudd, D.)
June 25, 2019 Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Swank regarding #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Rudd, D.)
June 25, 2019 Filing 4 Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Margie M King Hurdle. (Rudd, D.)
June 25, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Self-Representation filed by Margie M King Hurdle (Not Signed or dated). (Rudd, D.)
June 25, 2019 Filing 2 PROPOSED SEALED Medical Records: (Selected Participants Only)by (available to: Plaintiff Margie M King Hurdle) regarding #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Rudd, D.) Modified on 6/25/2019 to temporarily seal due to personal identifiers. (Rudd, D.)
June 25, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Margie M King Hurdle. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Waivers of Service, #5 Proposed Summons (Incomplete), #6 Proposed Appeal from the Federal Circuit along with Incomplete Waivers of Service) (Rudd, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hurdle v. Camp Lejeune, USMC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margie M King Hurdle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Camp Lejeune Water Supply
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veteran Adm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Jacksonville, NC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Congress of USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Off Base Dry Cleaners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Camp Lejeune, USMC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of the Navy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A-1 Dry Cleaners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacksonville Water Supply Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dept. of JAG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Government
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?