City of Wilmington v. Fidelity and Guaranty Insurance Underwriters, Inc.
Plaintiff: City of Wilmington
Defendant: Fidelity and Guaranty Insurance Underwriters, Inc. and The Travelers Indemnity Company
Case Number: 7:2019cv00124
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Filing 19 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Fidelity and Guaranty Insurance Underwriters, Inc., The Travelers Indemnity Company, filed by City of Wilmington. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A-Fidelity Policy) (Vickers, Jessica)
August 19, 2019 Filing 18 CORRECTED ORDER FOR DISCOVERY PLAN sent to all parties. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 8/19/2019. (Stouch, L.)
August 19, 2019 Filing 17 ***DISREGARD: See DE #18 *** ORDER FOR DISCOVERY PLAN sent to all parties. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 8/19/2019. (Stouch, L.) Modified on 8/19/2019 (Stouch, L.).
August 14, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint by Fidelity and Guaranty Insurance Underwriters, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Endorsements and Associated Underwriting Documents) (Maldonado, Jennifer)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Mark A. Michael terminated. Signed by Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 8/9/2019. (Stouch, L.)
August 9, 2019 Motion Submitted to Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle regarding #14 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney. (Stouch, L.)
August 9, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Fidelity and Guaranty Insurance Underwriters, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Michael, Mark)
August 7, 2019 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance filed by Sean T. Partrick on behalf of Fidelity and Guaranty Insurance Underwriters, Inc.. (Partrick, Sean)
August 7, 2019 Filing 12 Notice of Appearance filed by Jennifer D. Maldonado on behalf of Fidelity and Guaranty Insurance Underwriters, Inc.. (Maldonado, Jennifer)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal. Fidelity and Guaranty Insurance Underwriters, Inc. answer due 8/14/2019. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 7/15/2019. (Stouch, L.)
July 15, 2019 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal. (Stouch, L.)
July 15, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Fidelity and Guaranty Insurance Underwriters, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order) (Michael, Mark)
July 11, 2019 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance filed by Jessica Blair Vickers on behalf of City of Wilmington. (Vickers, Jessica)
July 11, 2019 Filing 8 Financial Disclosure Statement by City of Wilmington (Medford, Michael)
July 11, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by Michael T. Medford on behalf of City of Wilmington. (Medford, Michael)
July 11, 2019 Filing 6 Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Plaintiff's Counsel Michael T. Medford of Manning Fulton & Skinner, PA at PO Box 20389, Raleigh, NC 27619 via US Mail on July 11, 2019. (Rudd, D.)
July 11, 2019 Notice to Counsel - Counsel is reminded that the court prefers flattened pdf fillable forms. Counsel should "flatten" the Notice of Appearance, Civil Cover Sheet and the Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet prior to attaching it in accordance with Section to IV.B of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. No further action is needed. (Rudd, D.)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 Notice filed by Fidelity and Guaranty Insurance Underwriters, Inc. Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet. (Michael, Mark) (Main Document 5 flattened and replaced on 7/11/2019) (Edwards, S.).
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 Notice filed by Fidelity and Guaranty Insurance Underwriters, Inc. Civil Cover Sjheet. (Michael, Mark) (Main Document 4 flattened and replaced on 7/11/2019) (Edwards, S.).
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by Fidelity and Guaranty Insurance Underwriters, Inc. (Michael, Mark)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Mark A. Michael on behalf of All Defendants. (Michael, Mark) (Main Document 2 flattened and replaced on 7/11/2019) (Edwards, S.).
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Superior Court, New Hanover County, case number 19-CVS-2103. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5014011), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit state court summons, #2 Exhibit state court cover sheet, #3 Exhibit complaint and attachment, #4 Exhibit service of process papers, #5 Exhibit notice to state court clerk and party) (Michael, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Wilmington v. Fidelity and Guaranty Insurance Underwriters, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity and Guaranty Insurance Underwriters, Inc.
Represented By: Mark A. Michael
Represented By: Sean T. Partrick
Represented By: Jennifer D. Maldonado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Travelers Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Wilmington
Represented By: Michael T. Medford
Represented By: Jessica Blair Vickers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?